Smith v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Smith
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv00249
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 23 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 5/14/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 01:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed on 5/14/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Stubbs, Kara)
April 23, 2020 Filing 20 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Stubbs, Kara)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 04/23/2020 as Document No. 20, ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Docket entry deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6816365) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 8, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John Voorhees for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. In light of the fact that other counsel continue to represent Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Richard b. North Jr.'s Motion to Withdraw, Doc. #12 , is granted. Signed on 4/3/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to allow John Voorhees to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6807830) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to withdraw as attorney. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for withdrawal of attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Stubbs, Kara) Modified on 4/3/2020 to correct docket text (Houston, Kiambu).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/23/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 4/16/2020. Signed on 4/2/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 4/2/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the Consent of the Honorable Nanette K. Laughrey and pursuant to Local Rule 83.9, this case is hereby transferred. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. District Judge Roseann Ketchmark no longer assigned to case. Signed on April 2, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04932.
March 27, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-04932-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16353158 filed by Raymond Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Smith
Represented By: David M Langevin
Represented By: Rhett A McSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?