Ervin v. TD Ameritrade, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Ervin
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. and TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00266
Filed: April 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 24 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Patrick Ervin. (Marcus, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Patrick Ervin. TD Ameritrade, Inc. served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Marcus, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Patrick Ervin. TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Marcus, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Patrick Ervin. TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Marcus, David)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, up to and including June 8, 2020. Signed on 5/12/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by David L Marcus on behalf of Patrick Ervin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Marcus, David)
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Hans, Jason)
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hans, Jason)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 motion for leave to file excess pages. Defendants will be permitted an additional ten pages of argument as part of their suggestions in support of their motion to dismiss, and Plaintiff will be permitted an additional ten pages of argument as part of Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition to that motion. Signed on 5/7/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (El-Zein, Anna)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp., TD Ameritrade, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hans, Jason)
April 15, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/28/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 5/14/2020. Signed on 4/13/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips for all further proceedings. District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case Signed on 4/7/2020 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Theodore L. Kornobis for TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. and TD Ameritrade, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Stephen G. Topetzes for TD Ameritrade Clearing, Ameritrade Holdings Corp., and TD Ameritrade, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to randomly reassign this case for all further proceedings. Signed on 4/7/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to allow Theodore L. Kornobis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6810662) filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of All Defendants. (Hans, Jason)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to allow Stephen G. Topetzes to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6810654) filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of All Defendants. (Hans, Jason)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Related Case by TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp., TD Ameritrade, Inc. re #6 Notice of filing (Hans, Jason)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Notice of Related Case by Patrick Ervin (Marcus, David)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants' answers or other responses are due 5/11/2020. Signed on 04/06/2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Powers, Jo)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hans, Jason)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
April 4, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of Defendants TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp., TD Ameritrade, Inc..(Hans, Jason)
April 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number No. 2016-CV06369, All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6808489. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hans, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. TD Ameritrade, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Represented By: Theodore L. Kornobis
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Represented By: Theodore L. Kornobis
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Represented By: Theodore L. Kornobis
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ervin
Represented By: Jared Rose
Represented By: David L Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?