Abraham v. Cardinal Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samaria Abraham
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00321
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Cardinal Health 414, LLC.(Russell, Kyle)
May 20, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/30/2020. Signed on 5/15/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - GRANTING #6 motion to amend complaint. The Amended Petition attached as Exhibit A to plaintiffs motion, is deemed as filed as of the date of this Order. Signed on 5/6/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to amend/correct Petition for Damages filed by Mary M Johnson on behalf of Samaria Abraham. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnson, Mary) #1 Amended complaint Modified on 5/5/2020 at the request of counsel. Main document replaced and exhibit (1) added to correct filing oversight. NEF regenerated to all parties.(Kern, Kendra)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. answer is now due on or before 5/11/2020. Signed on 4/28/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages filed by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Russell, Kyle)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc..(Russell, Kyle)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2016-CV08329, filed by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6830575. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Documents filed in the State Court Action)(Russell, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham v. Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Amanda Sue Ebert Sisney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Amanda Sue Ebert Sisney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samaria Abraham
Represented By: Mary M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?