Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Reginald L. Thomas, Jason Mendenhall, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Kevin R Fahey, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Gabriel T Jones, Byron Hornung, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Mathew J Bowen, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund and Donald E Greenwell, III
Defendant: Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00366
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund on behalf of Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC.(Holland, James)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/7/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 7/24/2020. Signed on 6/23/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC answer due 7/2/2020. Signed on 6/18/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by James Rodney Holland, II on behalf of Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney James Rodney Holland, II added to party Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC(pty:dft))(Holland, James)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Defendant Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC served on 5/28/2020; answer due 6/18/2020. (Schuster, Aaron) Modified on 6/4/2020: Service date and answer date added to docket text. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
May 14, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Aaron Schuster on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6849946. Service due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuster, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Concrete Construction, LLC
Represented By: James Rodney Holland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald L. Thomas
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mendenhall
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R Fahey
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel T Jones
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Hornung
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew J Bowen
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Greenwell, III
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?