Buford v. Smitty's Supply Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sean Buford
Defendant: CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc. and Tractor Supply Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00428
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 66 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (63 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 64 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 28 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 93 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 89 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 174 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 58 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 75 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 55 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB) MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Rural King, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Rural King, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, Cross Claimant Rural King, Cross Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 22, 2020 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 64 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (30 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 77 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 176 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 57 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 91 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 95 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 65 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 66 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 60 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB) MOTION for protective order filed by Bryan White on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Duane Fosdick, Jack Kimmich, Terry Blackmore, Jason Klingenberg, Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Roger Bias, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Clinton Curry, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg, Jason Klingenberg, Jacob Mabie, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Wayne Rupe, Adam Sevy, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Randy Vilela, Randy Vilela, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes, George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes, Kirk Egner, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Dwayne Wurth, Sean Buford, Jason Klingenberg. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Bryan White added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Roger Bias(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla))(White, Bryan)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 7/20/2020 as Document No. 34, Consent MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel is directed to refile the motion bearing the signatures of attorneys only. The motion should not include a signature block for the presiding judge. Counsel is also directed to email the proposed order to the Courtroom Deputy in Microsoft Word format. The proposed order should not be filed as an attachment to the motion. This is a text entry only - no document is attached.(This also applies to Document No. 63 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB; Document No. 60 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB; Document No. 80 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB; Document No. 179 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB; Document No. 98 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB; Document No. 69 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB; Document No. 68 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB; and Document No. 94 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB) (Houston, Kiambu)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 7/20/2020 as Document No. 33, Joint MOTION for protective order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (This also applies to Document No. 62 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB; Document No. 59 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB; Document No. 79 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB; Document No. 178 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB; Document No. 97 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB; Document No. 68 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB; Document No. 67 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB; and Document No. 93 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB) (Houston, Kiambu)
July 20, 2020 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 A)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 61 SUGGESTIONS in support re (30 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 77 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 176 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 57 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 91 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 95 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 65 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 66 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 60 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB) MOTION for protective order filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendant Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 15, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for protective order filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Tractor Supply Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 15, 2020 Filing 59 SUGGESTIONS in support re (64 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 28 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 89 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 55 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 63 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 93 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 174 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 58 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 75 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB) MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Duane Fosdick, Jack Kimmich, Terry Blackmore, Jason Klingenberg, Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Roger Bias, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Clinton Curry, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg, Jason Klingenberg, Jacob Mabie, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Wayne Rupe, Adam Sevy, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Randy Vilela, Randy Vilela, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes, George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes, Kirk Egner, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Dwayne Wurth, Sean Buford, Jason Klingenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of appearance by Patricia Campbell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Roger Bias(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Roger Bias(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla))(Campbell, Patricia)
July 3, 2020 Filing 56 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discvoery Plan by Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Duane Fosdick, Jack Kimmich, Terry Blackmore, Jason Klingenberg(on behalf of himself and all others similarily situated), Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Mabie Trucking, Inc., Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Kirk Egner, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 3, 2020 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT -- Joint Report Describing The Lawsuit by Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg(on behalf of himself and all others similarily situated), Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 3, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Rural King, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Rural King. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 53 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants CAM2 International LLC, CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C..Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party CAM2 International L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party CAM2 International L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party CAM2 International L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 52 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Rural King, Rural King, Cross Claimant Rural King.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Rural King(pty:crc), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Rural King(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 51 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 50 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Cross Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc..Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:crd))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 49 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Tractor Supply Company(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Tractor Supply Company(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Tractor Supply Company(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 2, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for order Appointing Plaintiffs' Counsel Leadership Structure filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla))(Hubbard, Dirk)
June 30, 2020 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) by Buford Case Plaintiffs against CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Sean Buford.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 INITIAL ORDER. Signed on 6/19/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu)
June 18, 2020 Filing 45 Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Add Five Plaintiffs and to File Second Amended Complaint. (Doc. #42). As Defendants do not object and because leave should be freely given when justice so requires pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2), the Motion is granted. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Second Amended Complaint on or before June 30, 2020. Signed on 6/18/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 4, 2020 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00082.
June 3, 2020 Filing 43 TRANSFER ORDER transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Western District of Missouri as part of MDL No. 2936 In Re: Smitty's/CAM2 303 Tractor Hydraulic Fluid Marketing, Sales, Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Signed by the Chair of the Panel Karen K. Caldwell. (jak) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Add Five Plaintiffs and to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Sean Buford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Jennings, Christopher) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #40 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Final Scheduling Order. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion to add parties and amend pleadings is extended by fourteen (14) days to May 14, 2020. All other deadlines remain the same. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/29/2020. (kla) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Scheduling Order, Allowing Plaintiff an Extension of 14 days to Seek Leave to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings by Sean Buford (Jennings, Christopher) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 39 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/1/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom # 2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 4/30/2020; Discovery due by 10/1/2021; Motions due by 11/1/2021; Status Report due by 11/1/2021; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 2/1/2022. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/9/2020. (hml) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER Denying #22 Defendants' Motion to Stay. The Court has reviewed the briefing in this matter and held a telephonic hearing. The Court is not convinced that the prejudice to Plaintiff from a two-month stay would be anything more than negligible. But neither is the Court convinced there will be concrete and real hardship and inequity to the Defendants if discovery moves forward. The Court is concerned about potentially inconsistent discovery rulings among the various courts that have iterations of this case. Instead of a issuing a stay, the Court has made clear to the parties that it will not entertain any motions to compel discovery until after the JPML has ruled on the pending motion to consolidate and transfer the similar cases. The parties represented that the JPML will likely rule in the first half of June. Until the JPML reaches a decision, the Court's intention is to (1) have the parties engage in discovery that all parties agree is non-duplicative and appropriate, but at the same time (2) not require Defendants to engage with duplicative discovery requests, and (3) not require the Court to issue discovery rulings that might be inconsistent with rulings of its sister courts. The Court will provide for a longer-than-usual discovery period to ensure the foregoing decision does not leave the parties in a time crunch if the JPML denies the consolidation and transfer request. A Final Scheduling Order is forthcoming. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/09/2020. (kla) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 37 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky:Telephone Conference held on 4/8/2020 re #22 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Arguments taken under advisement. Order to be entered under separate entry. (Plaintiff: Bryan T. White, Christopher D. Jennings, Dirk Hubbard, John G. Emerson, Jr., and Thomas V. Bender; Defense: Mark S. Breeding and Nikki E. Cannezzaro; Court Reporter: Margie Kruse.) (hml) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Sean Buford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay (ED CA), #2 Exhibit Memorandum & Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay (ND IA), #3 Exhibit Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay (WD MO))(Jennings, Christopher) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 35 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Telephone Conference on #22 MOTION to Stay Proceedings: Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (hml) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay. The Sur-Reply is due by 11:59 p.m. CT on April 6, 2020. It may be no longer than five pages and must conform to the normal rules for spacing, font, and font-size. The Court will shortly be in touch with the parties to set a telephonic status conference at which the Motion for Stay will be argued and a potential Final Scheduling Order will be discussed. The status conference will occur sometime next week. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/31/2020. (kla) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay by Sean Buford (Jennings, Christopher) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by Sean Buford re #28 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum and Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay)(Jennings, Christopher) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation filed by CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Document)(Breeding, Mark) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #29 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/06/2020. (kla) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Response by All Defendants (Breeding, Mark) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation filed by Sean Buford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply Inc of Filing of JPML Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Motion to Transfer filed with MDL, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Memorandum in Support ofMotion to Transfer filed with MDL)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #24 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Defendants have up to, and including, February 21, 2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/13/2020. (kla) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Breeding, Mark) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM re #22 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation filed by CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company. (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation by CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Sean Buford. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #19 joint request and enters the following Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/05/2020. (ajt) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by CAM2 International LLC.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Nikki Cannezzaro's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/11/2019. (kla) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nikki Cannezzaro. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3596161. Filed by CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate)(Breeding, Mark) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/12/2020 and Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/5/2019.(hml) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CAM2 International LLC by Sean Buford. (Jennings, Christopher) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Smitty's Supply Inc.(Breeding, Mark) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Tractor Supply Company.(Breeding, Mark) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 This is a TEXT ENTRY Only. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/14/2019. (thd) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International LLC, filed by Sean Buford. [summons issued and returned to plaintiffs as to CAM2 International, LLC] (jap) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Smitty's Supply Inc, Tractor Supply Company by Sean Buford. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Bryan T. White is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/11/19. (mmb) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Bryan T. White. Fee $100.00 received. Receipt Number LIT073855. Filed by Sean Buford (jap) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 , #3 , #4 and #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Dirk L. Hubbard, Thomas V. Bender, William L. Carr and Gene P. Graham are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/10/19. (mmb) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Gene P. Graham. Fee $100.00 received. Receipt Number LIT073854. Filed by Sean Buford (jap) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William L. Carr. Fee $100.00 received. Receipt Number LIT073854. Filed by Sean Buford (jap) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thomas V. Bender. Fee $100.00 received. Receipt Number LIT073854. Filed by Sean Buford (jap) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Dirk L. Hubbard. Fee $100.00 received. Receipt Number LIT073854. Filed by Sean Buford (jap) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Sean Buford. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073692.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 6/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buford v. Smitty's Supply Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAM2 International L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark Steven Breeding
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty's Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Breeding
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Mark Steven Breeding
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Buford
Represented By: Bryan T White
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Dirk Hubbard
Represented By: Gene P. Graham
Represented By: William L Carr
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Patricia Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?