Zornes et al v. Smitty's Supply, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Terry Zornes, Randy Vilela, Adam Sevy and George Bollin
Defendant: CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Tractor Supply Company and Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC doing business as Orscheln Farm & Home
Case Number: 4:2020cv00431
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 182 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (63 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 64 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 28 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 93 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 89 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 174 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 58 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 75 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 55 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB) MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Rural King, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Rural King, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, Cross Claimant Rural King, Cross Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 22, 2020 Filing 181 Joint MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 180 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re (30 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 77 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 176 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 57 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 91 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 95 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 65 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 66 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 60 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB) MOTION for protective order filed by Bryan White on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Duane Fosdick, Jack Kimmich, Terry Blackmore, Jason Klingenberg, Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Roger Bias, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Clinton Curry, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg, Jason Klingenberg, Jacob Mabie, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Wayne Rupe, Adam Sevy, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Randy Vilela, Randy Vilela, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes, George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes, Kirk Egner, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Dwayne Wurth, Sean Buford, Jason Klingenberg. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Bryan White added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Roger Bias(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan White added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla))(White, Bryan)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 7/20/2020 as Document No. 34, Consent MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel is directed to refile the motion bearing the signatures of attorneys only. The motion should not include a signature block for the presiding judge. Counsel is also directed to email the proposed order to the Courtroom Deputy in Microsoft Word format. The proposed order should not be filed as an attachment to the motion. This is a text entry only - no document is attached.(This also applies to Document No. 63 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB; Document No. 60 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB; Document No. 80 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB; Document No. 179 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB; Document No. 98 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB; Document No. 69 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB; Document No. 68 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB; and Document No. 94 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB) (Houston, Kiambu)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 7/20/2020 as Document No. 33, Joint MOTION for protective order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (This also applies to Document No. 62 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB; Document No. 59 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB; Document No. 79 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB; Document No. 178 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB; Document No. 97 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB; Document No. 68 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB; Document No. 67 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB; and Document No. 93 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB) (Houston, Kiambu)
July 20, 2020 Filing 179 Consent MOTION for order Establishing ESI Protocols filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 A)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 178 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 177 SUGGESTIONS in support re (30 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 77 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 176 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 57 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 91 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 95 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 65 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 66 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 60 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB) MOTION for protective order filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendant Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 15, 2020 Filing 176 MOTION for protective order filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Tractor Supply Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 15, 2020 Filing 175 SUGGESTIONS in support re (64 in 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 28 in 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 89 in 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 55 in 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 63 in 4:20-cv-00434-SRB, 93 in 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 174 in 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 58 in 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 75 in 4:20-cv-00430-SRB) MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Duane Fosdick, Jack Kimmich, Terry Blackmore, Jason Klingenberg, Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Roger Bias, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Clinton Curry, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg, Jason Klingenberg, Jacob Mabie, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Wayne Rupe, Adam Sevy, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Randy Vilela, Randy Vilela, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes, George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes, Kirk Egner, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Dwayne Wurth, Sean Buford, Jason Klingenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 174 MOTION for order Adopting Master/Superseding Consolidated Amended Complaint Model and Allowing Direct Joinder of Additional Plaintiffs filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 173 NOTICE of appearance by Patricia Campbell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Roger Bias(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Roger Bias(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Patricia Campbell added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla))(Campbell, Patricia)
July 3, 2020 Filing 172 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discvoery Plan by Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Duane Fosdick, Jack Kimmich, Terry Blackmore, Jason Klingenberg(on behalf of himself and all others similarily situated), Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Mabie Trucking, Inc., Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Kirk Egner, Tim Sullivan, Tracy Sullivan, Dwayne Wurth, Terry Zornes. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 3, 2020 Filing 171 STATUS REPORT -- Joint Report Describing The Lawsuit by Roger Bias, Clinton Curry, Patrick Gisi, Arno Graves, Brian Hayes, William James, Ron Nash, Bryan Nelms, Matt Ortner, Anthony Shaw, Rusty Shaw, Jay Simpson, Randy Vilela, Jack Kimmich, Jason Klingenberg(on behalf of himself and all others similarily situated), Wayne Rupe, Jacob Mabie, Terry Blackmore, George Bollin, Sean Buford, Kirk Egner, Duane Fosdick. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Hubbard, Dirk)
July 3, 2020 Filing 170 MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of CAM2 International LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, CAM2 International L.L.C., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Rural King, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Rural King. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 169 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants CAM2 International LLC, CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C., CAM2 International L.L.C..Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party CAM2 International L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party CAM2 International L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party CAM2 International L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 168 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Rural King, Rural King, Cross Claimant Rural King.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Rural King(pty:crc), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Rural King(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 167 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 166 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Smitty's Supply, Inc., Cross Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc..Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Smitty's Supply, Inc.(pty:crd))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 3, 2020 Filing 165 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro on behalf of Defendants Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company, Tractor Supply Company.Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Tractor Supply Company(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Tractor Supply Company(pty:dft), Attorney Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro added to party Tractor Supply Company(pty:dft))(Cannezzaro, Nikki)
July 2, 2020 Filing 164 MOTION for order Appointing Plaintiffs' Counsel Leadership Structure filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:20-md-02936-SRB, 3:19-cv-05089-SRB, 4:20-cv-00428-SRB, 4:20-cv-00429-SRB, 4:20-cv-00430-SRB, 4:20-cv-00431-SRB, 4:20-cv-00432-SRB, 4:20-cv-00433-SRB, 4:20-cv-00434-SRB(Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Terry Blackmore(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party George Bollin(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Sean Buford(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Clinton Curry(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Kirk Egner(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Duane Fosdick(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Patrick Gisi(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Arno Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Brian Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party William James(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jack Kimmich(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jason Klingenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jacob Mabie(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Ron Nash(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Bryan Nelms(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Matt Ortner(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Wayne Rupe(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Adam Sevy(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Anthony Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Rusty Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Jay Simpson(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Tim Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Tracy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Randy Vilela(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Dwayne Wurth(pty:pla), Attorney Dirk L. Hubbard added to party Terry Zornes(pty:pla))(Hubbard, Dirk)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 INITIAL ORDER. Signed on 6/19/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Houston, Kiambu)
June 4, 2020 Filing 162 Case assigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough as member case of 20-md-2936-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
June 4, 2020 Filing 161 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:19-cv-02257.
June 4, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated.(hw) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 160 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL 2936). Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/4/2020. (hw) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 159 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice of Plaintiff Randy Vilela's Individual Claims Against Defendants Smitty's, Tractor Supply, and Orscheln by Randy Vilela. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 158 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice oF Individual Claims Against Defendant CAM2 International, LLC, Only by Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in support of #125 MOTION to Certify Class. Plaintiffs' reply deadline is extended to 6/8/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 13, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #156 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 155 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #153 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Redacted version of Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit - Redacted Redacted version of Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit - Redacted Redacted version of Exhibit 21)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/7/2020 to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class; granting #152 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 7, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class; and #152 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company re #125 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Respnse to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #149 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #125 MOTION to Certify Class. Defendants' response deadline is extended to 5/6/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 5, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #149 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 149 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Tractor Supply Company (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 148 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company re: #140 MOTION for Review of Magistrate's Order of March 18, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #125 MOTION to Certify Class. Defendants' response deadline is extended to 5/4/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 147 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/20/2020 to discuss Defendant Tractor Supply Company's ESI search process. See attached Minute Sheet for additional information. (ts)[Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 20, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #125 MOTION to Certify Class by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) At the parties' request, a Telephone Conference to discuss a discovery matter is set for 4/20/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants shall dial the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. By close of business on April 17, 2020, each side is to submit an email to ksd_james_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov with an attachment of no more than three pages summarizing their position. They shall also provide a copy to each other. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #140 MOTION for Review of Magistrate's Order of March 18, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Further Meet and Confer on Discovery Issues Prior to Filing a Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, to and including May 8, 2020, in which to file a motion to compel related to the discovery issues set forth in their motion. If the parties have not resolved their dispute by that date, they shall contact the Court at KSD_James_Chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov to schedule a discovery status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Further Meet and Confer on Discovery Issues by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION for Review of Magistrate's Order of March 18, 2020 by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #109 Defendants Smitty's Supply, Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Tractor Supply Company and Cam2 International, LLC's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Rulings by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; denying #114 Defendant Tractor Supply Company's Motion for Protective Order Relating to Deposition of Greg Sandfort; finding as moot #134 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Set Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings; finding as moot #136 Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order; and granting #138 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/18/2020. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Ex Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit List Exhibit Index, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #136 MOTION for Order Granting Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Related to Greg Sandfort Deposition, #114 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 136 MOTION for Order Granting Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Related to Greg Sandfort Deposition by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 135 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #134 Unopposed MOTION for Order Granting Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings, #109 MOTION to Stay Case proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION for Order Granting Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 133 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Tractor Supply Company re: #114 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Emails, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Smitty's Correspondence)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #125 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for the argument and authorities section of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification is extended to 34 pages. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on March 11, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #130 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted 1)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 129 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #128 Index of Exhibits,,, #127 Index of Exhibits,, #126 Index of Exhibits,, #125 MOTION to Certify Class Volume IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 85, #2 Exhibit 86, #3 Exhibit 87, #4 Exhibit 88, #5 Exhibit 89, #6 Exhibit 90, #7 Exhibit 91, #8 Exhibit 92, #9 Exhibit 93, #10 Exhibit 94, #11 Exhibit 95, #12 Exhibit 96, #13 Exhibit 97, #14 Exhibit 98, #15 Exhibit 99, #16 Exhibit 100, #17 Exhibit 101, #18 Exhibit 102, #19 Exhibit 103, #20 Exhibit 104, #21 Exhibit 105, #22 Exhibit 106, #23 Exhibit 107, #24 Exhibit 108, #25 Exhibit 109, #26 Exhibit 110, #27 Exhibit 111, #28 Exhibit 112, #29 Exhibit 113, #30 Exhibit 114, #31 Exhibit 115, #32 Exhibit 116)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 128 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #127 Index of Exhibits,, #126 Index of Exhibits,, #125 MOTION to Certify Class Volume III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 57, #2 Exhibit 58, #3 Exhibit 59, #4 Exhibit 60, #5 Exhibit 61, #6 Exhibit 62, #7 Exhibit 63, #8 Exhibit 64, #9 Exhibit 65, #10 Exhibit 66, #11 Exhibit 67, #12 Exhibit 68, #13 Exhibit 69, #14 Exhibit 70, #15 Exhibit 71, #16 Exhibit 72, #17 Exhibit 73, #18 Exhibit 74, #19 Exhibit 75, #20 Exhibit 76, #21 Exhibit 77, #22 Exhibit 78, #23 Exhibit 79, #24 Exhibit 80, #25 Exhibit 81, #26 Exhibit 82, #27 Exhibit 83, #28 Exhibit 84)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 127 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #126 Index of Exhibits,, #125 MOTION to Certify Class Volume II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29, #2 Exhibit 30, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 32, #5 Exhibit 33, #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit 37, #10 Exhibit 38, #11 Exhibit 39, #12 Exhibit 40, #13 Exhibit 41, #14 Exhibit 42, #15 Exhibit 43, #16 Exhibit 44, #17 Exhibit 45, #18 Exhibit 46, #19 Exhibit 47, #20 Exhibit 48, #21 Exhibit 49, #22 Exhibit 50, #23 Exhibit 51, #24 Exhibit 52, #25 Exhibit 53, #26 Exhibit 54, #27 Exhibit 55, #28 Exhibit 56)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 126 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #125 MOTION to Certify Class Volume I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Motion to Certify Class is extended to March 10, 2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on March 6, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #123 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Certify Class. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(rs) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Certify Class by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (White, Bryan). [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 122 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company re: #109 MOTION to Stay Case proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 121 INDEX OF EXHIBITS by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #114 MOTION for Protective Order (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #114 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #109 MOTION to Stay Case proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 118 OBJECTION(S) to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production of Documents by Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE of Filing of JPML Motion to Consolidate by CAM2 International, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Motion to Transfer filed with MDL, #2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer filed by MDL)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew R. Pickelman for Tractor Supply Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #114 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Tractor Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Tractor Supply Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION for attorney Matthew R. Pickelman to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5058876.) by Defendant Tractor Supply Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 112 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company re: #49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 111 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company re: #48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #109 MOTION to Stay Case proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION to Stay Case proceedings pending rulings by the judicial panel on multidistrict litigation by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: DISCOVERY HEARING held by telephone on 2/5/2020. Plaintiffs appeared through counsel, Thomas V. Bender and Dirk L. Hubbard. Defendants appeared through counsel, Nikki E. Cannezzaro. After discussing with counsel the history of their communications concerning the deposition of Greg Sandfort, the undersigned Magistrate Judge overruled Defendants' objection to the deposition on the basis of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c). Defendants' objection is untimely under D. Kan. Rule 26.2(b) and therefore does not stay the deposition. The deposition was properly noticed for February 7, 2020 (ECF No. 90). Plaintiffs' counsel acknowledged defense counsel's difficulties in producing the witness that day and requested Defendants produce him within the next 30 days. Accordingly, the Court extended until March 5, 2020 the #60 Amended Scheduling Order deadline for completion of class certification discovery, but only for the purpose of taking the deposition of Greg Sandfort. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn and #49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm. Defendants' reply deadline is extended to February 11, 2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on February 5, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 4, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #100 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #101 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, to Exclude the Testimony of Expert Witnesses Thomas F. Glenn and Werner J.A. Dahm. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #100 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #101 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, to Exclude the Testimony of Expert Witnesses Thomas F. Glenn and Werner J.A. Dahm by Defendants CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company ) (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) At the parties' request, a Discovery Hearing is set for 2/5/2020 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Counsel should dial the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE by George Bollin, Randy Vilela of Interrogatory Responses (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Third Motion to Extend Time to Further Meet and Confer Prior to Filing a Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are hereby granted an extension of time, to and including February 7, 2020, in which to file a motion to compel related to Defendants' responses and objections to Plaintiffs' First and Second Requests for Production. Plaintiffs shall contact the undersigned Magistrate Judge's chambers before seeking to further extend this deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/24/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes re #49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. 1 Dahm Report, #3 Ex. 2 Dahm C.V., #4 Ex. 3 Schenk Depo, #5 Ex. 4 Schenk Email, #6 Ex. 5 Brochures)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Smitty's by George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes. (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Steve Bennett on February 19, 2020 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Garrett Clement on February 18, 2020 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jenny Vernon on January 29, 2020 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jon Lorio on January 28, 2020 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Zornes and Sevy's Responses to First Interrogatories by Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes. (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn, and #49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' response deadline is extended to January 21, 2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on January 7, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 6, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm, #48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm, #48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant's Request for Production of Documents by George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes. (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Greg Sandfort on February 7, 2020 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs' First and Second Interrogatories and 1st and 2nd Requests for Production by Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Eddie Nashan on January 6, 2020 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 87 ADR REPORT by CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company. ADR session held on: 12/11/19 and conducted by Hon. Jay Daugherty. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Tractor Supply, Smitty's, Orscheln and CAM2's Disclosure of Expert Testimony on Class Certification Issues by CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 86 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: In-person DISCOVERY HEARING held on 12/19/2019. See attached minute sheet for orders. (Tape #TJJ 9:00 AM.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Request for Production of Documents by CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Cam2's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by CAM2 International, LLC. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Smitty's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories by Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Discovery Hearing set for 12/19/2019 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Parties to submit status reports no later than 12/16/2019. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jon Lorio on January 22, 2020 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of David Regenberg on January 22, 2020 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jenny Vernon on January 21, 2020 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Eddie Nashan on January 6, 2020 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Steve Bennett on January 15, 2020 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Garrett Clement on January 14, 2020 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production by Tractor Supply Company. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc. is granted an extension of time, to and including December 16, 2019, in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production of Documents and Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Discovery by Defendant Smitty's Supply, Inc (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for Production by Tractor Supply Company. (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production to all Plaintiffs by CAM2 International, LLC, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAM2 International, LLC identifying None as corporate parent (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 67 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint by CAM2 International, LLC.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Eddie Nashan on December 3, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting as unopposed #63 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Second Motion to Extend Time to Further Meet and Confer Prior to Filing a Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are hereby granted a 30-day extension of time, up to and including December 20, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel with respect to Defendants Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, and Orscheln Farm and Home LLC's responses and objections to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production. The parties shall contact the undersigned Magistrate Judge by email before seeking or agreeing to any further extensions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 64 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Steve Shockites on December 9, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER finding as moot #50 Defendants Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company and Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Allow Additional Time for Defendants' Expert Witness Designation. As agreed to by the parties, this motion is moot in light of the extensions requested in #56 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and the #60 Order granting the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #56 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and entering AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Class certification discovery deadline 2/17/2020. Motion for class certification deadline 3/6/2020. Discovery deadline 9/1/2020. The Court also extends until 11/27/2019 the deadline for Defendant Cam2 to answer or otherwise respond to #45 Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. With the permission of Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson, the deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Motions to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses (ECF Nos. 48 and 49) is extended to 1/6/2020. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/20/2019. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Tractor Supply Company.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Smitty's Supply, Inc.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 57 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jack Baker on December 4, 2019 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jon Lorio on December 3, 2019 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting as unopposed #52 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Further Meet and Confer Prior to Filing a Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are hereby granted a 7-day extension of time, up to and including November 20, 2019, in which to file a motion to compel with respect to Defendants Smitty's Supply, Inc., Tractor Supply Company, and Orscheln Farm and Home LLC's responses and objections to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for extension of time to Further Meet and Confer Prior to Filing Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 13, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm and #48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Terry Zornes of First Discovery to Cam2 International, LLC (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for extension of time by Defendants Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Werner Dahm by Defendants Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Attachments: #1 Suggestions in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions of Thomas Glenn by Defendants Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Suggestions in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by Plaintiffs George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jeremy Schenk on November 25, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE by George Bollin, Adam Sevy, Randy Vilela, Terry Zornes of Discovery to Smitty's, Tractor Supply, and Orscheln (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Terry Zornes, Randy Vilela, George Bollin, Adam Sevy.(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting as unopposed #43 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Join Additional Parties and to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall electronically file their proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiffs shall serve summons and the Second Amended Class Action Complaint upon the newly added defendant within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #32 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Steve Shockites on December 6, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Steve Bennett on November 26, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Garrett Clement on November 25, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 39 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held December 11, 2019 by Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes (Hubbard, Dirk) Modified on 11/1/2019 to modify title (ck). [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Smitty's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company of Defendants Responses to Pltf's Discovery (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Todd Milliken on October 30, 2019 (White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Tractor Supply's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Tractor Supply Company. (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: Status Conference held in person on 10/15/2019. Plaintiffs appeared through counsel, Dirk L. Hubbard and Bryan Turner White. Defendants appeared through counsel, Nikki E. Cannezzaro and Jacqueline A. Cook. The parties had timely submitted a joint status report which indicated they have resolved several discovery issues. The Court addressed additional matters, including Plaintiffs' agreement to extend until October 25, 2019 Defendants' deadline to fully respond to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production. The Court cautioned the parties to avoid discovery response extensions that could jeopardize compliance with the discovery deadline. The Court granted Plaintiffs' unopposed oral motion to extend until November 5, 2019 the Scheduling Order deadline to file a second amended complaint. In light of Plaintiffs' intention to further amend their complaint, the Court holds in abeyance Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to #32 Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint. The parties advised the Court they have scheduled mediation with Jay Daugherty on December 11, 2019, and will file their Notice of Mediation. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 33 DESIGNATION OF COMPARATIVE FAULT by Defendants Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company. (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company, filed by Terry Zornes, Adam Sevy.(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint. Plaintiffs shall electronically file their proposed First Amended Class Action Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Steve Bennett on October 11, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes of taking deposition of Jeremy Schenk on October 10, 2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION PROTOCOL by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosures of Expert Testimony on Class Certification Issues by Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(White, Bryan) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition by Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition by Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline re Class Certification 12/16/2019. Completion of all discovery 7/1/2020. Mediation Notice FILED or Confidential Settlement Report EMAILED to Magistrate Judge by 10/30/2019. Mediation deadline 12/16/2019. Status conference report emailed to chambers (no more than 3 pages) with issues to be addressed at the status conference by 10/9/2019. Status Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 (TJJ) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Motions for class certification due by 1/6/2020. See order for list of all schedules and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/13/2019. (ck) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct motion for class cert in this text entry. Order is correct. (ck). [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held in person on 8/27/2019. Phase I Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER limiting the disclosure, dissemination, and use of certain identified categories of confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/23/2019. (mn) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint and Stipulated Motion to Enter a Protective Order by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1)(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company of Rule 26 Disclosures (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Disclosures by Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and Request for Production by Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 8/6/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 8/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/12/2019. (ts) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline A. Cook on behalf of Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Cook, Jacqueline) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smitty's Supply, Inc identifying None as corporate parent (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC identifying None as corporate parent (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tractor Supply Company identifying None as corporate parent (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 Tractor Supplyl's ANSWER to Complaint by Tractor Supply Company.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 Orscheln Farm and Home's ANSWER to Complaint by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Smitty's Supply's ANSWER to Complaint by Smitty's Supply, Inc.(Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nikki E. Cannezzaro on behalf of Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company (Cannezzaro, Nikki) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Terry Zornes, Adam Sevy upon Smitty's Supply, Inc served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/11/2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/11/2019 for Defendants Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/27/2019. (ca) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Terry Zornes, Adam Sevy upon Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Terry Zornes, Adam Sevy upon Tractor Supply Company served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
June 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Smitty's Supply, Inc, Tractor Supply Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Adam Sevy, Terry Zornes. (Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4816877.), filed by Terry Zornes, Adam Sevy.(Hubbard, Dirk) [Transferred from ksd on 6/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zornes et al v. Smitty's Supply, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAM2 International L.L.C.
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Cook
Represented By: Nikki E. Cannezzaro
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty's Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Cook
Represented By: Nikki E. Cannezzaro
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Cook
Represented By: Nikki E. Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Matthew R Pickelman
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Cook
Represented By: Nikki E. Cannezzaro
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC doing business as Orscheln Farm & Home
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Cook
Represented By: Nikki E. Cannezzaro
Represented By: Nikki Eckland Cannezzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Zornes
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Represented By: William L Carr
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Patricia Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Vilela
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Represented By: William L Carr
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Patricia Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Sevy
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Represented By: William L Carr
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Patricia Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bollin
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Bryan Turner White
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Represented By: William L Carr
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Patricia Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?