Lingle v. Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Phillip Lingle
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00500
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Tom Plunkert(Kinder, Jacqueline)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/9/2021. Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2021, and by 7/12/2021. Trial to be set by future order. Please see text of order for additional deadlines. Counsel should note that the Court has not adopted all suggested deadlines. Signed on 7/31/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Phillip Lingle. (Simon, John)
June 24, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Notice to State Court of Filing Removal by Owners Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Kinder, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 6/19/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jacqueline M Kinder on behalf of Defendant Owners Insurance Company.(Kinder, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Owners Insurance Company.(Kinder, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Owners Insurance Company (Kinder, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Jacqueline M Kinder on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Kinder, Jacqueline)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cass County Circuit Court County, case number 20CA-CC00095, filed by Jacqueline M Kinder on behalf of Owners Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6908642. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinder, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lingle v. Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline M Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Lingle
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: John Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?