Johnson v. Baker Norton U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ANDRENELL JOHNSON
Defendant: Baker Norton U.S., Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, IVAX, L.L.C., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., f, Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., IVAX Corporation,, Johnson & Johnson, ALZA Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Research & Development LLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, L.L.C., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00544
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #16 motion for extension of time to file response to motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Signed on September 2, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Thomas McIntosh for Baker Norton U.S., Inc. and IVAX, L.L.C. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 32 Motion to allow Thomas G. McIntosh to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7022963) filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C.. (Verschelden, George)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Douglass A. Kreis for Andrenell Johnson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Neil D. Overholtz for Andrenell Johnson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Debra N. Guntner for Andrenell Johnson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 28 Motion to allow Neil D. Overholtz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7019562) filed by Lydia Lucius on behalf of Andrenell Johnson. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 27 Motion to allow Debra N. Guntner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7019558) filed by Lydia Lucius on behalf of Andrenell Johnson. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 Motion to allow Douglass Kreis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7019530) filed by Lydia Lucius on behalf of Andrenell Johnson. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. Janssen Research & Development LLC served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. Janssen Ortho LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. Johnson & Johnson served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. IVAX, L.L.C. served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. Baker Norton U.S., Inc. served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andrenell Johnson. ALZA Corporation served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Lucius, Lydia)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (unopposed) filed by Lydia Lucius on behalf of Andrenell Johnson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Lucius, Lydia)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Defendants Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C..(Verschelden, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Defendants Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Verschelden, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Francis Verschelden on behalf of Baker Norton U.S., Inc., IVAX, L.L.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney George Francis Verschelden added to party Baker Norton U.S., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney George Francis Verschelden added to party IVAX, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Verschelden, George)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed on August 14, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Penticuff, Paul)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Tracie J. Renfroe for ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson and Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney R. Bruce Hurley for ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC,Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, and Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to allow R. Bruce Hurley to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6980152) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Penticuff, Paul)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kristen R. Fournier for ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, and Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to allow Tracie J. Renfroe to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6980133) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Penticuff, Paul)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to allow Kristen R. Fournier to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6980110) filed by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC. (Penticuff, Paul)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Paul S Penticuff on behalf of ALZA Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC (Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party ALZA Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Janssen Ortho LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Janssen Research & Development LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S Penticuff added to party Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC(pty:dft))(Penticuff, Paul)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge Greg Kays. Please note the new case number: 20-544-CV-W-DGK. (Melvin, Greg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 7/31/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
July 10, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALZA Corporation, Baker Norton U.S., Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., IVAX, L.L.C., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, L.L.C. filed by Lydia Lucius on behalf of ANDRENELL JOHNSON. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6938828. Service due by 10/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucius, Lydia) Modified on 7/10/2020 main document replaced at the request of counsel to correct filing oversight. (Kern, Kendra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Baker Norton U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., f
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX Corporation,
Represented By: Thomas G. McIntosh
Represented By: George Francis Verschelden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALZA Corporation
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development LLC
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: R. Bruce Hurley
Represented By: Tracie J. Renfroe
Represented By: Kristen R. Fournier
Represented By: Paul S Penticuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRENELL JOHNSON
Represented By: Lydia Lucius
Represented By: Neil D. Overholtz
Represented By: Debra N. Guntner
Represented By: Douglass A. Kreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?