Farah v. Logisticare Solutions, LLC.
Plaintiff: Mohamad Farah
Defendant: Logisticare, Inc. and Logisticare Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00578
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER that upon the parties' communication to the Court of a forthcoming mediation session, and upon the parties' request, the Court will hold in abeyance a ruling on #174 Plaintiffs' motion for Rule 23 class certification pending the outcome of mediation. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of mediation by 11/30/2022 or within five days after the mediation is held, whichever is earlier. Signed on 11/4/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
September 20, 2022 Filing 188 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #174 MOTION to certify class filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Farah Signed Declaration, #2 Exhibit Revised Class Notice)(Related document(s) #174 ) (McInnes, Jack)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #186 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages as to a reply in support of his motion for class certification. Plaintiff's reply shall not exceed 15 pages. Signed on 9/20/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
September 19, 2022 Filing 186 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Austin Oneil Jaspers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jaspers, Austin)
September 6, 2022 Filing 185 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #174 MOTION to certify class filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 9/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #174 ) (Dean, Justin)
September 2, 2022 Filing 184 NOTICE of filing of Unsealed Exhibits by Mohamad Farah re #181 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, Order on Motion to Seal Document,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11)(Jaspers, Austin)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #182 Defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages as to its response to Plaintiff's motion for Rule 23 class certification. Defendant is granted an extension of ten (10) pages; Defendant's response to Plaintiff's class certification motion may not exceed twenty-five (25) pages. Signed on 8/31/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
August 31, 2022 Filing 182 MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Unopposed) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dean, Justin)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER (1) that Exhibits 1, 4, 7, 8, 10, and 11 be publicly filed; (2) denying without prejudice Defendant's request that these exhibits be filed under seal (see Doc. #180 (show-cause response)); and (3) finding as moot Plaintiff's motion for leave to file these exhibits under seal (Doc. #178 ). Plaintiff shall file unsealed Exhibits 1, 4, 7, 8, 10, and 11 in support of his motion for class certification (Doc. 174) by September 2, 2022. Signed on 8/30/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan)
August 26, 2022 Filing 180 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jones declaration 08-26-22)(Dean, Justin)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant's Show Cause Response as to #178 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file exhibits under seal is due by 8/26/2022. Signed on 8/19/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan)
August 18, 2022 Filing 178 MOTION for leave to file exhibits under seal, MOTION to seal document #175 Suggestions in Support of Motion,,, filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/1/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #175 ) (Koc, Kevin)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER that Doc. 176 class certification exhibits filed under seal is STRICKEN from the record. Absent filing a redacted document with the consent of the party who designated it as confidential under the Protective Order, to file such documents under seal, a party must seek permission to do so by filing a motion for leave to file the documents under seal. (See Protective Order, Doc. #85 at 6-7, para. 7.) Signed on 8/18/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
August 15, 2022 Filing 175 SUGGESTIONS in support re #174 MOTION to certify class filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Intent to File Exhibits Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Transportation Agreement, #3 Exhibit Farah Declaration, #4 Exhibit Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit Uzomah Declaration, #6 Exhibit Amendment to Transportation Agreement, #7 Exhibit Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit Provider Network Questionnaire, #10 Exhibit Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit McInnes Declaration, #13 Exhibit Koc Declaration, #14 Exhibit Reavey Declaration, #15 Exhibit Farah Declaration in Support of Motion for Rule 23 Class Certification, #16 Exhibit Proposed Notice)(Related document(s) #174 ) (McInnes, Jack) (Attachment 13 replaced on 8/16/2022 due to formatting error.) (Woods, Gloria).
August 15, 2022 Filing 174 MOTION to certify class filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/6/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McInnes, Jack) Modified on 8/16/2022 to reflect Suggestions in opposition/response due date pursuant to Doc. #170 Amended Scheduling Order. (Brown, Jonathan).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #172 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file excess pages as to suggestions in support of a motion for class certification. Plaintiff's suggestions in support of a motion for class certification shall not exceed 23 pages. Signed on 8/15/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
August 14, 2022 Filing 172 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/29/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McInnes, Jack)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #169 Joint MOTION to amend/correct Scheduling Order. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER #170 entered. Signed on August 8, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2023. Status Conference set for 2/1/2023 11:30 AM via teleconference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2023 01:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2023 01:30 PM, and Jury Trial set for 8/28/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Back-up Jury Trial set for 9/11/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on August 8, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 3, 2022 Filing 169 Joint MOTION to amend/correct Scheduling Order filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/17/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(McInnes, Jack)
July 22, 2022 Filing 168 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (D's Supplemental Objections & Responses to P's 1st RFPDs) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
July 19, 2022 Filing 167 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (First Supplemental Answers & Objections to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Benjamin Darwin Ashworth terminated. Signed on 7/13/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
July 13, 2022 Filing 165 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Benjamin Darwin Ashworth on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ashworth, Benjamin)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #163 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Abigail S. Wallach for Logisticare Solutions, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
July 7, 2022 Filing 163 Motion to allow Abigail S. Wallach to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8007590) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Dean, Justin)
June 16, 2022 Filing 162 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/16/2022 by teleconference. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Austin Oneil Jaspers, Jack D McInnes. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Justin M. Dean. Time in court: 10:32 AM to 11:13 AM. Discussion held as noted on the record. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Annisa Justice, 816-512-5622, annisa_justice@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
June 14, 2022 Filing 161 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Status Conference set for 6/16/2022 10:30 AM in Chambers by teleconference before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The call-in number is 888-557-8511 and the access code is 4626639. (Brown, Jonathan)
June 14, 2022 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Status Conference scheduled for June 16, 2022 at 10:03 AM has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
June 13, 2022 Filing 160 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Status Conference set for 6/16/2022 10:03 AM in Chambers by teleconference before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The call-in number is 888-557-8511 and the access code is 4626639. (Brown, Jonathan)
June 9, 2022 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (First Interrogatories & First Request for Production of Documents to 14 opt-ins) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
May 19, 2022 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents for 17 opt-ins) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
April 20, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
April 19, 2022 Filing 157 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ginnie Crimmins(McInnes, Jack)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 joint motion for amended protective order. Signed on 4/4/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan)
April 4, 2022 Filing 155 Joint MOTION for protective order (Amended Protective Order) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dean, Justin)
March 25, 2022 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF TRANSMISSION OF DEPOSITION of Mohamed Farah. (Melvin, Greg) Modified on 3/25/2022: Document deleted as it is a duplicate filing of Doc. 153. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
March 25, 2022 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF TRANSMISSION OF DEPOSITION of Mohamed Farah. (Crocker, Susan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC of combined interrogatories and request for production of documents to 63 opt-ins filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 List of 63 Opt-ins)(Dean, Justin)
March 18, 2022 Completion of Discovery for class/collective action purposes due by 5/18/2022 per Order (doc. 151). (Wheeler, LaTandra)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #149 Plaintiff's motion for extension of deadlines. The parties are informed that future proposed scheduling orders and motions for extension of deadlines will be treated with caution because of the directives of the Civil Justice Reform Act. Signed on 3/9/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
March 9, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (Jones, Robin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 150 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ginnie Crimmins(McInnes, Jack)
March 4, 2022 Filing 149 MOTION to amend/correct 104 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #102 Amended Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Related document(s) 104 , #102 ) (McInnes, Jack)
February 24, 2022 Filing 148 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ginnie Crimmins(McInnes, Jack)
February 11, 2022 Filing 147 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark: DISCOVERY HEARING held on 2/10/2022. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Jack D. McInnes, Kevin C. Koc. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Justin M. Dean. Time in court: 2:30 PM to 3:05 PM. Discovery rulings as noted on the record. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jean Crawford, 816-512-5642, jean_crawford@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
February 11, 2022 Filing 146 NOTICE to take deposition of Mohamad Farah filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #143 Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant's opt-in discovery as stated in the motion. Signed on 2/4/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
February 2, 2022 Filing 144 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Hearing set for 2/10/2022 at 02:30 PM in Chambers by teleconference before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The call-in number is 888-557-8511 and the access code is 4626639.(Brown, Jonathan)
January 31, 2022 Filing 143 MOTION for extension of time to respond to opt-in discovery filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/14/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McInnes, Jack)
January 17, 2022 Filing 142 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
January 10, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
January 5, 2022 Filing 140 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
January 4, 2022 Filing 139 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 30, 2021 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC First Interrogatories and First Request for Documents to 31 opt-ins filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
December 30, 2021 Filing 137 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 29, 2021 Filing 136 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 28, 2021 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC 1st Interrogatories & First Request for Documents to 3 opt-ins filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
December 28, 2021 Filing 134 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 28, 2021 Filing 133 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 21, 2021 Filing 132 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 17, 2021 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to 20 opt-ins) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
December 17, 2021 Filing 130 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 16, 2021 Filing 129 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 15, 2021 Filing 128 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 13, 2021 Filing 127 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 10, 2021 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (1st Interrogatories & Requests to 5 opt-ins) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
December 10, 2021 Filing 125 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 10, 2021 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (1st Interrogatories & 1st Request for Production of Documents to 9 opt-ins) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
December 10, 2021 Filing 123 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 9, 2021 Filing 122 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
December 3, 2021 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (1st Interrogatories and Document Requests) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - list of 84 opt ins)(Dean, Justin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 120 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 26, 2021 Filing 119 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Forms)(Koc, Kevin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 118 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 19, 2021 Filing 117 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 17, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 15, 2021 Filing 115 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 12, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 11, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS)(Koc, Kevin)
November 9, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 5, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
November 3, 2021 Filing 110 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
October 29, 2021 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (D's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to P Uzomah) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 107 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
October 27, 2021 Filing 106 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
October 19, 2021 Filing 105 NOTICE of filing Consent to Join Forms by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms)(McInnes, Jack)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Consent MOTION to amend/correct 102 Amended Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions. Signed on September 30, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The Notice and corresponding deadline(s) are extended. All other deadline(s) and hearing(s) remain the same. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
September 29, 2021 Filing 103 Consent MOTION to amend/correct #102 Amended Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #102 ) (McInnes, Jack)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #100 Joint MOTION to amend/correct Scheduling Order. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed on September 28, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER finding as moot #99 motion to amend/correct scheduling order due to the filing of #100 joint motion to amend/correct scheduling order. Signed on 9/14/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to amend/correct Scheduling Order filed by Austin Oneil Jaspers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Jaspers, Austin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION to amend/correct #65 Scheduling Order (Unopposed Motion for Extension to Designate Experts in Opposition to R23 Class Certification) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #65 ) (Dean, Justin)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and finding as moot in part #97 Plaintiff's second motion for extension of time to file a reply and to designate experts, and finding as moot #95 and #96 . Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file a reply in support of #92 motion for extension of time to designate experts is moot after the Court granted Plaintiff's motion on 8/17/2021 94 . Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to designate experts is granted. Deadline extended to 9/13/2021. No further extensions to this deadline will be granted absent a clear demonstration of extraordinary circumstances. Signed on 9/9/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 97 Second MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, 94 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, (Unopposed), Second MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed) filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[], 94 ) (Koc, Kevin)
September 8, 2021 Filing 96 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #95 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to Set Motion and R&R Deadlines (Unopposed) filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #95 ) (Koc, Kevin)
August 30, 2021 Filing 95 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to Set Motion and R&R Deadlines filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/13/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[]) (Koc, Kevin)
August 16, 2021 Reply suggestions re #92 motion for extension of time to designate expert due by 8/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Crocker, Susan)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #92 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to designate experts. Deadline extended to 9/10/2021. No further extensions to this deadline will be granted absent a clear demonstration of extraordinary circumstances. Signed on 8/16/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion to Designate Expert (not in opposition) by Logisticare Solutions, LLC re #92 MOTION for extension of time to designate expert (Dean, Justin). Reply suggestions due by 8/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Modified on 8/17/2021 to correct docket event and set response deadline. (Crocker, Susan).
August 11, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for extension of time to designate expert filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Koc, Kevin)
July 23, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE of appearance by Austin Oneil Jaspers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Austin Oneil Jaspers added to party Mohamad Farah(pty:pla))(Jaspers, Austin)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Robert Wasserman terminated. Signed on 6/24/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
June 16, 2021 Filing 89 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wasserman, Robert)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER (1) granting #54 motion to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification); (2) denying #61 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; and (3) granting #82 motion for leave to file sur-reply. Signed on 6/7/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Casey, Susan)
May 25, 2021 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (Defendant's Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Request for Documents) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
April 14, 2021 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mohamad Farah filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah.(Wasserman, Robert)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 motion for protective order. Agreed Protective Order adopted herein. Signed on 3/25/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan)
March 25, 2021 Filing 84 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dean, Justin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 83 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #82 MOTION for leave to file a Surreply in Opposition to P's Amended Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. Reply suggestions due by 3/24/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #82 ) (McInnes, Jack)
March 5, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION for leave to file a Surreply in Opposition to P's Amended Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply)(Dean, Justin)
March 5, 2021 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mohamad Farah of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah.(Koc, Kevin)
February 26, 2021 Filing 80 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b) filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Wasserman, Robert)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 motion for extension of time to file reply in support of #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b). Reply suggestions due on or before 2/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 2/25/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #76 consent motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 2/25/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
February 25, 2021 Filing 77 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b) filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Koc, Kevin)
February 25, 2021 Filing 76 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Koc, Kevin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 75 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #61 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Dean, Justin)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply re #54 Amended MOTION for Conditional Collective Class Certification. Reply suggestions now due by 2/25/2021. Signed on 2/11/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to file reply in support of conditional collective action certification filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wasserman, Robert)
February 2, 2021 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah.(Wasserman, Robert)
February 1, 2021 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 70 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #61 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. Reply suggestions due by 2/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Wasserman, Robert)
January 28, 2021 Filing 69 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 2/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jones Declaration)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Dean, Justin)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER (1) granting #66 Defendant's motion for leave to file 7 excess pages; and (2) granting #67 Plaintiff's motion for extension of time such that suggestions in opposition to Defendant's partial motion to dismiss #61 are now due by 1/29/2021. Signed on 1/27/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan)
January 26, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for extension of time to respond to motion to partially dismiss filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wasserman, Robert)
January 26, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Unopposed) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dean, Justin)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SCHEDULING ORDER: Completion of discovery for class/collective action purposes due by 10/10/2021. Signed on January 21, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 15, 2021 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Logisticare Solutions, LLC (of First ROGs & RFPDs to Plaintiff) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
January 12, 2021 Filing 63 ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Dean, Justin)
January 12, 2021 Filing 62 SUGGESTIONS in support re #61 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sean Jones)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Dean, Justin)
January 12, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/26/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dean, Justin)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER finding as moot #33 motion to certify class per #54 amended motion to certify class. Signed on 1/8/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #58 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b).Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 1/7/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan) Modified on 1/7/2021 (Dollar, Jordan).
January 7, 2021 Filing 58 Second MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b), #55 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #54 , #55 ) (Dean, Justin)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Logisticare Solutions, LLC answer due 1/12/2021. Logisticare's response to the motion for class certification is due 1/15/21. Signed on 12/24/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 23, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #53 Amended Complaint, #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b), #55 Suggestions in Support of Motion, Unopposed filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #53 , #54 , #55 ) (Dean, Justin)
December 21, 2020 Filing 55 SUGGESTIONS in support re #54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b) filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Wasserman, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Filing 54 Amended MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certification pursuant to Rule 216b) filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wasserman, Robert)
December 21, 2020 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Logisticare Solutions, LLC filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Mohamad Farah.(McInnes, Jack)
December 21, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of filing Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint by Mohamad Farah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(McInnes, Jack)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Response due 1/8/21. Signed on 12/17/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #33 MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certificationpursuant to Rule 216b), #43 Suggestions in Support of Motion,, (Unopposed) filed by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #33 , #43 ) (Dean, Justin)
December 9, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
December 8, 2020 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Joe Eischens(McInnes, Jack)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER finding as moot #34 motion to stay per #47 Order denying motion to compel arbitration. Signed on 12/8/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan) Modified on 12/8/2020 (Dollar, Jordan).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #10 motion to compel arbitration without prejudice. Signed on 12/8/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Christian S. Briggs terminated. Signed on 12/7/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Lauren M. Blas terminated. Signed on 12/7/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Michele L Maryott terminated. Signed on 12/7/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 6, 2020 Filing 43 SUGGESTIONS in support re #33 MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certificationpursuant to Rule 216b) filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Farah Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Transportation Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - LogistiCare Provider Network Questionnaire, #5 Exhibit 5 - Uzomah Decl., #6 Exhibit 6 - Amendment to Transportation Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Proposed Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 - Koc Decl.)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Koc, Kevin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Christian S. Briggs on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Briggs, Christian)
December 4, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Lauren M. Blas on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blas, Lauren)
December 4, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Michele L Maryott on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Maryott, Michele)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 motion for leave to file suggestions in excess of page limitation.Signed on 12/3/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Kathleen M Nemechek terminated. Signed on 12/3/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nemechek, Kathleen)
December 2, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of filing Amended Consent to Join Lawsuit - Felix Uzoma by Mohamad Farah (Koc, Kevin) Modified docket text to reflect amended consent to join on 12/3/2020 (Crocker, Susan).
December 2, 2020 Filing 35 SUGGESTIONS in support re #34 MOTION to stay re #10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (MOTION TO STAY CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL BILATERAL ARBITRATION PENDING A RULING CONDITIONAL CERTIFCATION) filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Koc, Kevin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to stay re #10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (MOTION TO STAY CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL BILATERAL ARBITRATION PENDING A RULING CONDITIONAL CERTIFCATION) filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Koc, Kevin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to certify class (i.e. conditional class certificationpursuant to Rule 216b) filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Suggestions in Support of Motion)(Koc, Kevin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to file suggestions in support in excess of page limit filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Koc, Kevin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of appearance by Darin Shreves on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC (Attorney Darin Shreves added to party Logisticare Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Shreves, Darin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of appearance by Justin M. Dean on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC (Attorney Justin M. Dean added to party Logisticare Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Dean, Justin)
November 20, 2020 Filing 29 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. (Koc, Kevin) Modified on 11/23/2020 to correct docket text (Crocker, Susan).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 motion for extension of time to file joint proposed scheduling order. Signed on 11/19/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Christian S. Briggs on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Briggs, Christian)
November 5, 2020 Filing 26 Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC's re #10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (Sur-Reply) filed by Jack D McInnes on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. (Related document(s) #10 ) (McInnes, Jack) Modified on 11/9/2020 to correct docket event (Crocker, Susan).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 motion for leave to file a sur-reply. Plaintiff shall file the sur-reply within 7 days. Signed on 11/3/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to file sur-reply filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-reply)(Koc, Kevin)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Nemechek, Kathleen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Plaintiff Mohamad Farah. Reply suggestions due by 10/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Contract)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Koc, Kevin)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 motion for one-day extension of time to file response/reply. Signed on 10/9/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 Second MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings through October 9, 2020 filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 18 , #10 ) (Koc, Kevin)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/4/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/18/2020. Signed on October 5, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Plaintiff's response to the motion to compel arbitration is due 10/8/20. Signed on 10/1/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan) Modified on 10/2/2020 (Dollar, Jordan).
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wasserman, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance by Robert Wasserman on behalf of Mohamad Farah (Attorney Robert Wasserman added to party Mohamad Farah(pty:pla))(Wasserman, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michele L. Maryott for Logisticare Solutions, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Lauren M. Blas for Logisticare Solutions, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christian S. Briggs for Logisticare Solutions, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC.(Nemechek, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Defendant Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Jones)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Nemechek, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to compel Bilateral Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nemechek, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to allow Michele L. Maryott to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7050706) filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Nemechek, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to allow Lauren M. Blas to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7050693) filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Nemechek, Kathleen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to allow Christian S. Briggs to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7050659) filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Nemechek, Kathleen)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing (Amended Consent to Join of Mohamad Farah) by Mohamad Farah re #1 Complaint, (Koc, Kevin)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Logisticare Solutions, LLC answer/responsive pleading due 9/17/2020.. Signed on 8/24/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Logisticare Solutions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Kathleen M Nemechek added to party Logisticare Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Nemechek, Kathleen)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (McInnes, Jack)
August 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Logisticare Solutions, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Logisticare Solutions, LLC. filed by Kevin C. Koc on behalf of Mohamad Farah. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6956920. Service due by 10/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koc, Kevin) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/3/2020 at the request of counsel) (Houston, Kiambu).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farah v. Logisticare Solutions, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamad Farah
Represented By: Benjamin Darwin Ashworth
Represented By: Jack D McInnes
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Reavey
Represented By: Kevin C. Koc
Represented By: Austin Oneil Jaspers
Represented By: Robert Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logisticare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logisticare Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Christian S. Briggs
Represented By: Kathleen M Nemechek
Represented By: Lauren M. Blas
Represented By: Michele L Maryott
Represented By: Justin M. Dean
Represented By: Darin Shreves
Represented By: Abigail S. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?