Haak v. Saul
Plaintiff: Heather D. Haak
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00656
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Siegert, Karen)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/18/2020 as Document No. 4, Return of Service. The document has been deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 8/5/2020 Social security answer due by 10/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 11/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Served: Atty General 8/10/20; US Atty 8/5/20; Office of Regional Counsel 8/5/20)(Overton, Kathleen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Heather D. Haak. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Heather D. Haak. Service due by 11/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - GRANTING #1 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's counsel shall electronically file the Complaint within twenty days of the date of this Order, and shall be responsible for serving process in the manner described in Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed on 8/18/20 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Heather D. Haak. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/31/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Heather D. Haak(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haak v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather D. Haak
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?