Uniloc 2017 LLC v. H and R Block, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: H and R Block, Inc., H&R Block Enterprises LLC and HRB Digital LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00659
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order of Dismissal. Signed on 9/3/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of appearance by Michael L. Nepple on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Attorney Michael L. Nepple added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Nepple, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Nepple, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 61 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 8:19-cv-01149.
December 26, 2019 Filing 60 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING CASE) (shb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and TRANSFERS Unilocs claims against HRB Digital to the Western District of Missouri. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (shb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 58 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #43 previously set for 12/9/2019 at 1:30 pm is continued to 12/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #43 by Judge James V. Selna: The Court sets Defendants motion for hearing on December 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. The Status Conference set by Judge Carter for December 4, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. is ordered VACATED. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE filed. Pursuant to minute order filed on 11/08/2019. Case returned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 8:19-cv-01149 JVS(KESx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RESCINDING TRANSFER ORDER #51 AND SCHEDULING ORDER #53 . Should the motion to dismiss be denied, the Court remains amenable to the transfer of this case. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 54 STATEMENT Opposition to Relation of Cases Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.3.3 and Request to Rescind Transfer Order filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., H&R Block Enterprises, LLC, HRB Digital LLC re: Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #51 . (Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING STATUE/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court VACATES all pending case management and motion hearing dates and sets a Status/Scheduling Conference for December 4, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Status Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01061 DOC(KESx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01149 DOC(KESx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #43 filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., H&R Block Enterprises, LLC, HRB Digital LLC. (Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date #44 . Motion hearing continued to 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9-19-19 10:00 a.m. re Transcript #47 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seffens, Sharon) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9-19-19 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number sseffens@earthlink.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (Seffens, Sharon) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant H and R Block, Inc., H&R Block Enterprises, LLC, HRB Digital LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Margaret Landsborough at mlandsborough@jonesday.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Silveira, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 45 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #43 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing from November 4, 2019 to November 18, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue #43 filed by plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC.(Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., H&R Block Enterprises, LLC, HRB Digital LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Danielle Hilton, #3 Proposed Order) (Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 40 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #37 filed by Defendants HRB Digital LLC, H&R Block Enterprises, LLC, H and R Block, Inc..(Attorney Andrea Weiss Jeffries added to party H&R Block Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Jury Trial May 4, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference April 19, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off January 18, 2021. Expert Discovery Cut-off January 18, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-off March 15, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Claim Construction June 15, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than September 18, 2020. (See document for further details.) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS #28 by Judge James V. Selna: On September 12, 2019 the plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint. The Court therefore VACATES the hearing on Defendant H&R Block, Inc and HRB Digital LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue set for September 23, 2019 as MOOT. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order, #32 filed by plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 37 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC, H&R Block Enterprises, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 36 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC.. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - PRESUMPTIVE SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL DATES)(Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY reply is in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue #28 filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Terrell Brown, #2 Declaration Decl. of Andrea Jeffries)(Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew J Silveira on behalf of Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC (Attorney Matthew J Silveira added to party H and R Block, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J Silveira added to party HRB Digital LLC(pty:dft))(Silveira, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for INSTRUCTING DEFENDANTS, H&R BLOCK, INC. AND HRB DIGITAL LLC, TO IDENTIFY SUBSIDIARIES AND INVOLVEMENT WITH ACCUSED SYSTEMS filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue #28 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Aaron S. Jacobs, #3 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,324,578, #4 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,069,293, #5 Exhibit C - excerpts from the 2019 Annual Report of H&R Block, Inc., #6 Exhibit D - download from HRBlock website, #7 Exhibit E - download from Google Maps, #8 Exhibit F - SEC filings by HRBlock, #9 Exhibit G - email sent to HRB counsel)(Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith B. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/16/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24273518) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Improper Venue filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Scott W. Andreasen, #3 Declaration of Andrea W. Jeffries, #4 Exhibit 1-7 to Declaration of Andrea W. Jeffries, #5 Proposed Order) (Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith B. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/16/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24273518) filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants HRB Digital LLC, H and R Block, Inc..(Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith B. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24273518) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application, not EX PARTE. (lt) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #23 Non-Resident Attorney Keith B. Davis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant H&R Block, Inc and HRB Digital LLC, designating Andrea W. Jeffries as local counsel. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keith B. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24273518) filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CONDUCT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having considered DEFENDANTS APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO CONDUCT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (the Application), finds that the Application is well taken and GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for August 19, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. is continued to September 19, 2019 [note date change] at 9:30 a.m. The Joint Rule 26(f) report with the completed Exhibit A is due by September 12, 2019 [note date change]. (yl) Modified on 8/9/2019 (yl). [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 First APPLICATION to Continue Initial Status Conference from 08/19/2019 to 09/16/2019 filed by Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC. Application set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith Davis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order) (Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants HRB Digital LLC, H and R Block, Inc..(Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrea Weiss Jeffries on behalf of Defendants H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC (Attorney Andrea Weiss Jeffries added to party H and R Block, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Weiss Jeffries added to party HRB Digital LLC(pty:dft))(Jeffries, Andrea) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, upon Defendant H and R Block, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bonnie Love, Intake Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, upon Defendant HRB Digital LLC served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Managing Agent in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant H and R Block, Inc.. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant H and R Block, Inc., HRB Digital LLC. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/12/2019. (lb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:19-cv-01062 AG(DFMx) (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #9 Non-Resident Attorney James J. Foster APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC, designating Matthew D. Vella as local counsel. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James J. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23959358) Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vella, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC Uniloc 2017 LLC. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01062 (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23890588 - Fee: $400, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Aaron Seth Jacobs added to party Uniloc 2017 LLC(pty:pla))(Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. H and R Block, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: James J Foster
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Matthew David Vella
Represented By: Michael L. Nepple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H and R Block, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Hendershot
Represented By: Keith B Davis
Represented By: Matthew J Silveira
Represented By: Andrea Weiss Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael C Hendershot
Represented By: Keith B Davis
Represented By: Matthew J Silveira
Represented By: Andrea Weiss Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRB Digital LLC
Represented By: Michael C Hendershot
Represented By: Keith B Davis
Represented By: Matthew J Silveira
Represented By: Andrea Weiss Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?