Whitworth v. Jackson County
Plaintiff: Dartanyon Whitworth
Defendant: Jackson County
Case Number: 4:2020cv00661
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Defendant Jackson County.(Diel, Dawn)
September 16, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Schmitt, Bernard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Dartanyon Whitworth. (Schmitt, Bernard)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael S. Shipley on behalf of Dartanyon Whitworth. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shipley, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION to remand filed by Michael S. Shipley on behalf of Plaintiff Dartanyon Whitworth. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Shipley, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to remand filed by Michael S. Shipley on behalf of Dartanyon Whitworth. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shipley, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jackson County filed by Michael S. Shipley on behalf of Dartanyon Whitworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Ordinance 3972, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Ordinance 4690, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Ordinance 5355)(Shipley, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to stay re #7 MOTION to certify class filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Jackson County. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Diel, Dawn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Defendant Jackson County. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Diel, Dawn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Jackson County. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Diel, Dawn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION to certify class filed by Bernard T. Schmitt on behalf of Plaintiff Dartanyon Whitworth. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Schmitt, Bernard)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to certify class filed by Bernard T. Schmitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schmitt, Bernard)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 8/19/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Shawver, Marylynn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE - The Administrative Transfer from Judge Gaitan to Judge Bough has been voided. Upon further inspection, no conflict of interest exists. This case remains assigned to the Honorable Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Please note the case number: 4:20-00661-CV-W-FJG. (Jones, Robin)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Melody Leigh Roberts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Melody Leigh Roberts added to party Dartanyon Whitworth(pty:pla))(Roberts, Melody)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 VOIDED - ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr., this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:20-00661-CV-W-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin) Modified on 8/19/2020 to reflect transfer was voided (Jones, Robin).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 2016-cv14628, filed by Dawn Joanna Diel on behalf of Jackson County. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6997388. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diel, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitworth v. Jackson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County
Represented By: Dawn Joanna Diel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dartanyon Whitworth
Represented By: Bernard T. Schmitt
Represented By: Michael S. Shipley
Represented By: Melody Leigh Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?