Mycroft AI Inc. v. Voice Tech Corporation
Plaintiff: Mycroft AI Inc.
Defendant: Voice Tech Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00662
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/4/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/18/2020. Signed on October 5, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Voice Tech Corporation.(Gilman, Stacey)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing of an action regarding patent number(s) 9,794,348 and 10,491,679. Plaintiff(s): Mycroft AI Inc. Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Jean A. Maneke Maneke Law Group, LC 2345 Grand Blvd. Suite 1600 Kansas City, MO 64112 (816) 753-9000 Fax: (816) 753-9009 Email: jmaneke@manekelaw.com Defendant(s): Voice Tech Corporation Lead Attorney for Defendant(s): Stacey R. Gilman Berkowitz Oliver LLP-KCMO 2600 Grand Boulevard Suite 1200 Kansas City, MO 64108 (816) 561-7007 Fax: (816) 561-1888 Email: sgilman@berkowitzoliver.com The civil complaint is attached. (Woods, Gloria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Civil Complaint) (Woods, Gloria).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Defendant Voice Tech Corporation.(Gilman, Stacey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2016-CV14194, filed by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Voice Tech Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6997530. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Papers, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jamal Asafi, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilman, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mycroft AI Inc. v. Voice Tech Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voice Tech Corporation
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mycroft AI Inc.
Represented By: Jean A. Maneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?