Greater Kansas City Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Rick Wood Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Training Fund, Greater Kansas City Laborers Welfare Fund, Reginald L. Thomas, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, Caleb McCandless, Greater Kansas City Laborers Pension Fund and Donald E Greenwell, III
Defendant: Rick Wood Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00671
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney David M. Buffo terminated as counsel for Defendant Rick Wood Construction. Signed on 10/14/20 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by David M. Buffo on behalf of Rick Wood Construction, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buffo, David)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rick Wood Construction, Inc.'s answer is due 10/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the Court. Signed on 9/24/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by David M. Buffo on behalf of Rick Wood Construction, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Buffo, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by David M. Buffo on behalf of Rick Wood Construction, Inc. (Attorney David M. Buffo added to party Rick Wood Construction, Inc.(pty:dft))(Buffo, David)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP reassignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Sollars, Bradley)
August 20, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rick Wood Construction, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7002238. Service due by 11/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sollars, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater Kansas City Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Rick Wood Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Training Fund
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Adams
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Adams
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald L. Thomas
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Adams
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Adams
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb McCandless
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Adams
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Adams
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E Greenwell, III
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Adams
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wood Construction, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Buffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?