Bowers v. The Great American Gymnastics Express, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: The Great American Gymnastics Express, Inc. doing business as Gage Center and Alvin Louis Fong
Case Number: 4:2020cv00701
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/23/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/6/2020. Signed on 09/25/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Casey, Susan)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Alvin Louis Fong, The Great American Gymnastics Express, Inc..(Attorney Matthew McKain Clifford added to party Alvin Louis Fong(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew McKain Clifford added to party The Great American Gymnastics Express, Inc.(pty:dft))(Clifford, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alvin Louis Fong, The Great American Gymnastics Express, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 ***Remark Remark AO-121 and docket sheet mailed to: Register of Copyrights U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E. Washington,D.C 20559-6000. (Woods, Gloria)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing AO 121 by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7025705. Service due by 12/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. The Great American Gymnastics Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Great American Gymnastics Express, Inc. doing business as Gage Center
Represented By: Matthew McKain Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Louis Fong
Represented By: Matthew McKain Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?