Marshall v. Weber et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Marshall
Defendant: David Wahlert, Lavonne Walbert and Jonathan Weber
Interested Party: NPC International, Inc,
Case Number: 4:2020cv00757
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Dismissal entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Any party may move to reopen the case, provided that a motion is filed within 30 days from the date the bankruptcy stay is lifted or from the date of final resolution of the bankruptcy case. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over this case. Signed on 11/20/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Order Extending the Automatic Stay to Certain Debtors; issued by the Southern District of Texas by NPC International, Inc, (Houston, Kiambu)
October 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Wahlert, Lavonne Walbert, Jonathan Weber. (Kern, Kendra)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 9/23/20 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert L Kinsman on behalf of Kristin Marshall. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7058957. Service due by 12/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Weber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wahlert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavonne Walbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Marshall
Represented By: Robert L Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NPC International, Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?