Fogarty et al v. ISD Renal, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert C. Fogarty and David W. Gurley
Defendant: Davita, Inc. doing business as DaVita Kidney Care doing business as DaVita Integrated Kidney Care and ISD Renal, Inc. doing business as DaVita Kidney Care doing business as DaVita Integrated Kidney Care
Case Number: 4:2020cv00780
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants filed by Garrett Mark Hodes on behalf of Plaintiffs Robert C. Fogarty, David W. Gurley.(Hodes, Garrett)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Karen R. Glickstein on behalf of Defendants Davita, Inc., ISD Renal, Inc..(Glickstein, Karen)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/14/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 11/30/2020. Signed on 10/28/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Davita, Inc., ISD Renal, Inc..(Attorney Karen R. Glickstein added to party Davita, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Karen R. Glickstein added to party ISD Renal, Inc.(pty:dft))(Glickstein, Karen)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Davita, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Hodes, Garrett)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. ISD Renal, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Hodes, Garrett)
September 29, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Davita, Inc., ISD Renal, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Garrett Mark Hodes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7068089. Service due by 12/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Hodes, Garrett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogarty et al v. ISD Renal, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Fogarty
Represented By: Garrett Mark Hodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Gurley
Represented By: Garrett Mark Hodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davita, Inc. doing business as DaVita Kidney Care doing business as DaVita Integrated Kidney Care
Represented By: Camille L Roe
Represented By: Karen R. Glickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISD Renal, Inc. doing business as DaVita Kidney Care doing business as DaVita Integrated Kidney Care
Represented By: Camille L Roe
Represented By: Karen R. Glickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?