Godinez et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Yosila Godinez, N. V. E. and Oscar Velasquez Esteban
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 4:2020cv00828
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01833.
October 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/23/2020. (nbn) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #11 Order on Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/02/2020. (lcjeb3) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Transfer Case and Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that 1) this case shall be TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Missouri; and 2) Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by October 23, 2020. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/02/2020. (lcjeb3) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond filed by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond filed by N. V. E., YOSILA GODINEZ, OSCAR VELASQUEZ ESTEBAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sharma-Crawford, Rekha) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case and, MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/20/2020 (Sharma-Crawford, Rekha) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/17/2020 (Sharma-Crawford, Rekha) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/17/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2020. (Sharma-Crawford, Rekha) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by YOSILA GODINEZ, N. V. E., OSCAR VELASQUEZ ESTEBAN. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by N. V. E., OSCAR VELASQUEZ ESTEBAN, YOSILA GODINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons USCIS, #2 Summons Summons AUSA)(Sharma-Crawford, Rekha) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 8, 2020 SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.....INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7311101) filed by YOSILA GODINEZ, OSCAR VELASQUEZ, OSCAR VELASQUEZ ESTEBAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons DHS, #3 Summons Summons USCIS, #4 Summons Summons AUSA)(Sharma-Crawford, Rekha) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 10/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godinez et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yosila Godinez
Represented By: Rekha Sharma-Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. V. E.
Represented By: Rekha Sharma-Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Velasquez Esteban
Represented By: Rekha Sharma-Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?