Erin Goldsmith et al v. Alterra Mountain Company et al
Plaintiff: Isabel C. Ossa and Erin Goldsmith
Defendant: Alterra Mountain Company, Arch Insurance Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 4:2020cv00832
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-05722.
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2955, transferring case to USDC, Western District of Missouri for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, and with the consent of that court, assigned to Honorable Brian C. Wimes. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Walker, Jessica) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter - Mailed certified copy of Order #17 re Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Alterra and Ikon are transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for coordination and/or consolidation before Judge Raymond P. Moore with Civil docket Sheet. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO SEVER CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS ALTERRA MOUNTAIN COMPANY AND IKON PASS, INC AND TRANSFER TO DISTRICT OF COLORADO PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404 (DKT. #16 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Alterra and Ikon are severed from Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Arch, and Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Alterra and Ikon are transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for coordination and/or consolidation before Judge Raymond P. Moore. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of Colorado filed by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE (DKT. #14 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the stipulation is APPROVED, and Defendants' deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint shall be extended from Monday, 8/17/2020 to 15 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues its rulings in In re: National Ski Pass Insurance Litigation, MDL No. 2955. The parties shall file a status report by 9/14/2020, as to whether a hearing date has been set in the MDL proceeding as to a potential transfer, and shall also file a report within five days of any rulings on the requests for a transfer. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 23, 2020 re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swanholt, Erik) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DEADLINE (DKT. #9 by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the First Amended Complaint, is extended to 8/17/2020. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company in Opposition to James Bradley's Motion for Coordination of Various Ski Pass-Related Actions and Transfer of those Actions to the Eastern District of Arkansas and in Support of their Request for Consolidation of Only those Actions Involving Ski Passes Insured by Arch and Transfer of Those Actions to the Eastern District of New Jersey (Swanholt, Erik) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.. (Morgan, Shon) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc., (Morgan, Shon) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 08/17/2020 re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft))(Morgan, Shon) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #4 served on June 26, 2020. (Walker, Jessica) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vcr) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 26, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Arch Insurance Company, Does, Ikon Pass, Inc., filed by plaintiffs Erin Goldsmith, Isabel C. Ossa. (filed in state court 5/19/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 26, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Arch Insurance Company, Does, Ikon Pass, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Erin Goldsmith. (filed in state court 5/1/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company, identifying Arch Reinsurance Company, Arch Capital Group (U.S.) Inc., Arch Financial Holdings Europe I Limited, Arch Reinsurance Europe Underwriting Designated Activity Company, Arch Financial Holdings Europe II Limited, Arch Reinsurance LTD., Arch Capital Group LTD.. (Swanholt, Erik) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Erik K. Swanholt re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 In support of Defendant Arch Insurance Company's Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Swanholt, Erik) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Swanholt, Erik) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV17165 Receipt No: ACACDC-26976423 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint and Summons) (Attorney Erik K Swanholt added to party Arch Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Swanholt, Erik) [Transferred from cacd on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erin Goldsmith et al v. Alterra Mountain Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alterra Mountain Company
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Erik K. Swanholt
Represented By: Jessica N Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikon Pass, Inc.
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel C. Ossa
Represented By: Graham Lambert
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Goldsmith
Represented By: Graham Lambert
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?