Harman v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Walter Harman
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00888
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/4/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/18/2021. Signed on December 4, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Hayes, Tracy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Inc.. (Hayes, Tracy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Walmart Inc..(Hayes, Tracy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County at Independence County, case number 2016-CV19582, filed by Tracy M. Hayes on behalf of Walmart Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7133242. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayes, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harman v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Tracy M. Hayes
Represented By: Bradley S. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Harman
Represented By: Blaine E. Dickeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?