City of Kansas City, Missouri v. Popson
Plaintiff: City of Kansas City, Missouri
Defendant: Tomas Caesar Popson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00899
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 RECEIPT number KCMO087494 in the amount of $505 issued to Tomas Popson. (Crocker, Susan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit Court of Appeals is 20-3454 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Tomas Caesar Popson. (Terry, Jason)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #8 Notice of Appeal. (Terry, Jason)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Tomas Popson's Motion For Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, (Doc. 6), is DENIED. Signed on 11/23/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 11/23/20 to Tomas Caesar Popson, 401 Indiana Ave., Kansas City, MO 64124. (Cordell, Annette)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tomas Caesar Popson. Filing fee $0.00. (Melvin, Greg)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Tomas Caesar Popson. (Melvin, Greg)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION for leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Tomas Caesar Popson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
November 18, 2020 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Melvin, Greg) Mailed, via certified mail 7012 3460 0001 7395 5094, to 16th Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO, 415 East 12th Street, Kansas City, MO, 64106 on 11/18/2020 (Crocker, Susan).
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (McIlvain, Kelly) Modified on 11/17/2020: A copy of this Clerks Judgment was mailed via regular US Mail on 11/17/20 to Tomas Caesar Popson, 401 Indiana Ave., Kansas City, MO 64124 (Cordell, Annette).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 -Popsons motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied and the case is remanded to state court. Signed on 11/17/2020 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (McIlvain, Kelly) Modified on 11/17/2020: A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 11/17/20 to Tomas Caesar Popson, 401 Indiana Ave., Kansas City, MO 64124.(Cordell, Annette).
November 10, 2020 Chief District Judge Beth Phillips added. District Judge Stephen R. Bough no longer assigned to case. (Crocker, Susan)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 83.9(c), and with the consent of Chief Judge Beth Phillips, this case is hereby transferred to Chief Judge Phillips for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/10/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Tomas Caesar Popson. (Woods, Gloria)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tomas Caesar Popson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Kansas City, Missouri v. Popson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Caesar Popson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Kansas City, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?