Milburn v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jessica Marie Milburn
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00918
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
November 19, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jessica Marie Milburn. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ifp) filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Jessica Marie Milburn. Service due by 2/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 11/19/20 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jessica Marie Milburn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Attorney Cathleen A Shine added to party Jessica Marie Milburn(pty:pla))(Shine, Cathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milburn v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Marie Milburn
Represented By: Cathleen A Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?