Kyle v. Sam's East, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kyle
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. and Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Raymore Sam's Club No. 8243
Case Number: 4:2020cv00933
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2021. Teleconference set for 1/5/2022 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2022 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 1/15/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Sam's East, Inc.. (Friesen, Kehl)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael W Wharton on behalf of Plaintiff Cheryl Kyle.(Wharton, Michael)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kehl Friesen on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Friesen, Kehl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Kyle filed by Michael W Wharton on behalf of Plaintiff Cheryl Kyle.(Wharton, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. of Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Cheryl Kyle filed by Kehl Friesen on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Friesen, Kehl)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/14/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 12/31/2020. Signed on 11/30/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Kehl Friesen on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. (Attorney Kehl Friesen added to party Sam's East, Inc.(pty:dft))(Friesen, Kehl)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. (Jarrow, James)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Sam's East, Inc..(Jarrow, James)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Jarrow, James)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cass County, case number 20CA-CC00227, Sam's East, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-7156304. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jarrow, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle v. Sam's East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kyle
Represented By: Michael W Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Jarrow
Represented By: Kehl Friesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Raymore Sam's Club No. 8243
Represented By: James R. Jarrow
Represented By: Kehl Friesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?