Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Emily C Kesler on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC.(Kesler, Emily)
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Emily C Kesler on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Buick GMC Dealer Agreement, #2 Exhibit Cadillac Dealer Agreement, #3 Exhibit Dealer Agreement Standard Provisions, #4 Exhibit 12-20-19 Notice, #5 Exhibit 1-17-20 Demand for Mediation, #6 Exhibit 1-17-20 Conklin MO Protest, #7 Exhibit 1-24-20 Admin Notice of Stay, #8 Exhibit 1-23-20 Shawnee KS Admin Complaint, #9 Exhibit 3-27-20 Conklin Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #10 Exhibit 3-19-20 APA First Amendment, #11 Exhibit 9-1-20 Sellers Termination Letter)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Kesler, Emily)
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Emily C Kesler on behalf of General Motors LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kesler, Emily)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 consent motion for leave to file excess pages. Defendant General Motors LLC is granted five (5) extra pages of supporting suggestions in favor of its' forthcoming motion to dismiss. Supporting suggestions for Defendant's motion shall not exceed twenty (20) pages, exclusive of exhibits, signature blocks, certificates of service, and statements of fact. Signed on 3/1/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages for Memorandum in Support of GM's Motion to Dismiss filed by Louis S Chronowski, Jr on behalf of General Motors LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Chronowski, Louis)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time. Defendant's answer or response due on or before March 3, 2021. Any response by Plaintiff shall be due on or before April 2, 2021. Any reply shall be due on or before April 16, 2021. Signed on 2/1/2021 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Emily C Kesler for General Motors LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Emily C. Kesler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7259154) filed by Madison Marie Johnston on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Johnston, Madison)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Louis Chronowski, Jr for General Motors LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to allow Louis S. Chronowski, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7259067) filed by Madison Marie Johnston on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Johnston, Madison)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for extension of time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Madison Marie Johnston on behalf of General Motors LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnston, Madison)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Madison Marie Johnston on behalf of General Motors LLC (Attorney Madison Marie Johnston added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Johnston, Madison)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC. General Motors LLC served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Hamblin, Scott)
January 11, 2021 SUMMONS REISSUED as to MC-CSCI, Registered Agent for General Motors LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Steven Blatt for Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to allow Steven Blatt to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7210046) filed by Scott Allen Hamblin on behalf of Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC. (Hamblin, Scott)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Scott Allen Hamblin on behalf of Plaintiff Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC.(Hamblin, Scott)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC filed by Scott Allen Hamblin on behalf of Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number 5547510. Service due by 4/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Hamblin, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).
January 4, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors LLC. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Louis S Chronowski, Jr
Represented By: Madison Marie Johnston
Represented By: Emily C Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conklin Fangman Kansas City LLC
Represented By: Scott Allen Hamblin
Represented By: Steven Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?