Gregg v. Saul
Plaintiff: Zachary Gregg
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 4:2021cv00009
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jill A Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Zachary Gregg. (Filing fee $402 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Zachary Gregg. Service due by 4/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Compliant shall be filed within seven days. Signed on 1/7/21 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Suroff, Rebecca)
January 6, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: Plaintiff must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 1/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Zachary Gregg. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Zachary Gregg(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregg v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Gregg
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?