Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. v. Jet Midwest Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.
Defendant: Skyblueocean Ltd and Jet Midwest Group, LLC
Intervenor: F. Paul Ohadi, Trustee of F. Paul Ohadi Trust Dated Dec. 15, 1999, Alta Airlines Holdings, LLC, KMW Business Jets, LLC, KMW Leasing XII 6-767 and KMW Leasing XI 757
Case Number: 4:2021cv00096
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Referring Judge: Jill A Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/13/2021 as Document No. 27, MOTION to intervene and Suggestions in Support. The document has been deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
April 13, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to intervene and Suggestions in Support filed by Kersten Holzhueter on behalf of F. Paul Ohadi, Trustee of F. Paul Ohadi Trust Dated Dec. 15, 1999, KMW Business Jets, LLC, Alta Airlines Holdings, LLC, KMW Leasing XII 6-767, KMW Leasing XI 757. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Intervenors' Complaint)(Attorney Kersten Holzhueter added to party F. Paul Ohadi, Trustee of F. Paul Ohadi Trust Dated Dec. 15, 1999(pty:intv), Attorney Kersten Holzhueter added to party KMW Business Jets, LLC (pty:intv), Attorney Kersten Holzhueter added to party Alta Airlines Holdings, LLC(pty:intv), Attorney Kersten Holzhueter added to party KMW Leasing XII 6-767(pty:intv), Attorney Kersten Holzhueter added to party KMW Leasing XI 757(pty:intv))(Holzhueter, Kersten)
April 8, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of filing Reply Suggestions in Support of Petition to Confirm and Enforce Foreign Arbitral Award by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. re #24 Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lee, Carol)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/10/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 4/26/2021. Signed on 3/29/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 26, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, /Response in Opposition to Petition to Confirm and Enforce Foreign Arbitral Award on behalf of Jet Midwest Group, LLC, Skyblueocean Ltd.(Gardner, Bradley)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number 21-cv-00096-FJG. Signed on 3/11/2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Kern, Kendra)
March 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of appearance by Kelsey Elizabeth Hodgdon on behalf of Jet Midwest Group, LLC, Skyblueocean Ltd (Attorney Kelsey Elizabeth Hodgdon added to party Jet Midwest Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kelsey Elizabeth Hodgdon added to party Skyblueocean Ltd(pty:dft))(Hodgdon, Kelsey)
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of appearance by Bradley Robert Gardner on behalf of Jet Midwest Group, LLC, Skyblueocean Ltd (Attorney Bradley Robert Gardner added to party Jet Midwest Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley Robert Gardner added to party Skyblueocean Ltd(pty:dft))(Gardner, Bradley)
March 9, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, /Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondents to Respond to Petitioner's Petition to Confirm and Enforce Foreign Arbitral Award by Jet Midwest Group, LLC, Skyblueocean Ltd. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gardner, Bradley)
March 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of filing Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.'s March 8, 2021 Letter to Court by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. (Lee, Carol)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Carol Lee for Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
March 8, 2021 Filing 17 Motion to allow Carol Lee to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7319244) filed by Carrie Phillips on behalf of Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. (Phillips, Carrie)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michelle K. Ng for Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Geoffrey Sant for Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Eric B Epstein for Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to allow Michelle K. Ng to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7316336) filed by Carrie Phillips on behalf of Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. (Phillips, Carrie)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to allow Geoffrey Sant to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7316330) filed by Carrie Phillips on behalf of Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. (Phillips, Carrie)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to allow Eric B. Epstein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7316320) filed by Carrie Phillips on behalf of Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. (Phillips, Carrie)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris to District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Please note the new case number: 21-0096-CV-W-HFS. (Melvin, Greg)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Signed on 3/1/21 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Gibbins, Peter) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/2/2021) (Gibbins, Peter).
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MW-3)(Phillips, Carrie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. Skyblueocean Ltd served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA-1)(Phillips, Carrie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. Jet Midwest Group, LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Phillips, Carrie)
February 17, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jet Midwest Group, LLC, Skyblueocean Ltd. (Woods, Gloria)
February 17, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 3/10/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing N. Keep Declaration in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, Carrie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing M. Ng Declaration in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Phillips, Carrie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Suggestions in Support of Petition to Confirm and Enforce Foreign Arbitral Award by Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Phillips, Carrie)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Confirm and Enforce Foreign Arbitral Award against All Defendants filed by Carrie Phillips on behalf of Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7287718. Service due by 5/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Phillips, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd. v. Jet Midwest Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Top Jet Enterprises, Ltd.
Represented By: Carrie Phillips
Represented By: Geoffrey Sant
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Represented By: Michelle K Ng
Represented By: Carol Lee
Represented By: Eric B Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyblueocean Ltd
Represented By: Bradley Robert Gardner
Represented By: Kelsey Elizabeth Hodgdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Midwest Group, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Robert Gardner
Represented By: Kelsey Elizabeth Hodgdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: F. Paul Ohadi, Trustee of F. Paul Ohadi Trust Dated Dec. 15, 1999
Represented By: Kersten Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alta Airlines Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kersten Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KMW Business Jets, LLC
Represented By: Kersten Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KMW Leasing XII 6-767
Represented By: Kersten Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KMW Leasing XI 757
Represented By: Kersten Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?