Frederick Tan v. The Folger Coffee Company et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Plaintiff: Frederick Tan
Defendant: THE FOLGER COFFEE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2021cv00220
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 34 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-09370.
April 1, 2021 Filing 33 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2984, transferring case to USDC, Western District of Missouri and assigned to Honorable Beth Phillips. Case transferred electronically. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. No. #22 ; 45); and (2) VACATING the January 11, 2021 Hearing. Any future filings related to either of these matters shall be made under only the lead case number, No. 5:20-cv-00992-JGB-SHK. The Court further appoints two coordinating Plaintiffs counsel, one each from the Ashton and Tan cases. The clerk is ordered to administratively close 2:20-cv-09370. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.), Cases associated with Lead Case EDCV20-992 JGB(SHx). (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #28 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Application for Pro Hac Vice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David N Lake counsel for Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Adding Patricia Syverson as counsel of record for Frederick Tan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David N Lake counsel for Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Adding Elaine Ryan as counsel of record for Frederick Tan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David N Lake counsel for Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Adding Carrie Laliberte as counsel of record for Frederick Tan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (More than 30 days), #26 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, Defendant the Folger Coffee Companys (Folgers) deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending the Courts decision on the Motion to Consolidate. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 14 Days after order on consolidation is entered (exact date TBD) re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Folger Coffee Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension to Respond to Complaint)(Attorney Ronald Y Rothstein added to party The Folger Coffee Company(pty:dft))(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. TEXT ENTRY NO. 24 WAS ISSUED IN ERROR AND IS STRICKEN. The motion to consolidate 2:20-cv-09370-JGB-SHK #22 remains on calendar on 1/11/2021 as previously stipulated. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 24 (STRICKEN) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The hearing on the MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 5:20-cv-00992-JGB-SHK, #22 is continued from 11/30/20 to 12/7/20 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 11/25/2020 (mga). [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 5:20-cv-00992-JGB-SHK, #22 filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 5:20-cv-00992-JGB-SHK, filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Motion set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Paskowitz Declaration In Support of Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Folger Coffee Company answer now due 12/7/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Folger Coffee Company.(Attorney Megan Lee Whipp added to party The Folger Coffee Company(pty:dft))(Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Emily Komlossy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan Plaintiff, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Laurence D. Paskowitz APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan Plaintiff, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Beth A. Keller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan Plaintiff, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-00992 JGB(SHKx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09370 JGB(SHKx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laurence D. Paskowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28639352) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily C. Komlossy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28638762) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth A. Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28638599) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Related Case(s): 5:20-cv-00992 (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan, upon Defendant The Folger Coffee Company served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Emily Komlossy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Beth A. Keller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laurence D. Paskowitz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Folger Coffee Company. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan, (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28505566 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. (Attorney David N Lake added to party Frederick Tan(pty:pla))(Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick Tan v. The Folger Coffee Company et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FOLGER COFFEE COMPANY
Represented By: Megan Lee Whipp
Represented By: Ronald Y Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Tan
Represented By: Patricia N. Syverson
Represented By: Emily C. Komlossy
Represented By: Laurence D Paskowitz
Represented By: Beth A. Keller
Represented By: David N. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?