Shelly Ashton et al v. The J.M. Smucker Co. et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Plaintiff: Frederick Tan, Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener and Ramon Ibarra
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive, The Folger Coffee Co. and The J.M. Smucker Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00221
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 72 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-00992.
April 1, 2021 Filing 71 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2984, transferring case to USDC, Western District of Missouri and assigned to Honorable Beth Phillips. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Jereige counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Adding Amanda Jereige as counsel of record for The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company. (Attorney Amanda Jereige added to party The Folger Coffee Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Jereige added to party The J.M. Smucker Co.(pty:dft))(Jereige, Amanda) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan Lee Whipp counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Megan L. Whipp is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company. (Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021. Discovery cut-off 11/22/2021. Motions cut-off 2/14/2022. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/27/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (npo) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #64 Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #65 Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Laliberte APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 65 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie Ann Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30875668) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 64 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine Ann Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30875581) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
February 15, 2021 Filing 63 The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Patricia N Syverson on behalf of Interested Party Frederick Tan (Attorney Patricia N Syverson added to party Frederick Tan(pty:ip))(Syverson, Patricia) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 61 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener, Interested Party Frederick Tan.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wand, Aubry) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 60 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate (Dkt. No. #22 ; #45 ); and (2) VACATING the January 11, 2021 Hearing. Case No. 5:20- cv-00992-JGB-SHK shall be consolidated both for purposes of trial and all pre- trial proceedings, including discovery. Any future filings related to either of these matters shall be made under only the lead case number, No. 5:20-cv-00992-JGB-SHK. The Court further appoints two coordinating Plaintiffs counsel, one each from the Ashton and Tan cases. The clerk is ordered to administratively close 2:20-cv-09370. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co..(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. (Braden, Scott) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 56 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #36 ); and (2) VACATING the December 21, 2020 Hearing. Plaintiffs must file an amended complaint, if any, by December 21, 2020. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #54 Non-Resident Attorney Lubna M. Faruqi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shelly Ashton and Jay Schoener Plaintiff, designating Benjamin Heikali as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 54 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lubna M. Faruqi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29529449) filed by plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 53 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #36 set for hearing on 12/7/2020 is continued to 12/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. TEXT ENTRY NO. 51 WAS ISSUED IN ERROR AND IS STRICKEN. The motion to consolidate 2:20-cv-09370-JGB-SHK #45 remains on calendar on 1/11/2021 as previously stipulated. The hearing on the Motion to Dimiss #36 is continued from 11/30/20 to 12/7/20 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 51 (STRICKEN) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The hearing on the MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:20-cv-09370-JGB-SHK, #45 is continued from 11/30/20 to 12/7/20 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 11/25/2020 (mga). [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:20-cv-09370-JGB-SHK, #45 filed by Interested Party Frederick Tan. (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Briefing and Hearing Dates on Motion to Consolidate #46 . ( Responses due by 12/7/2020, Replies due by 12/28/2020., Motion hearing continued to 1/11/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #47 served on 11/23/2020. (Wand, Aubry) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 47 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:20-cv-09370-JGB-SHK, #45 filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali)(Attorney Aubry Wand added to party Shelly Ashton(pty:pla), Attorney Aubry Wand added to party Ramon Ibarra(pty:pla))(Wand, Aubry) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Consolidate, Defendant's Response to Opposition to Motion to Consolidate, Plaintiff in Tan Action's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Consolidate, and Continue and Set Hearing Date filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali In Support of Stipulation to Extend Briefing and Hearing Date on Motion to Consolidate, #2 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Briefing and Hearing Dates on Motion to Consolidate)(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:20-cv-09370-JGB-SHK, filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Motion set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Paskowitz Declaration In Support of Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney David N Lake added to party Frederick Tan(pty:ip)) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #36 ), scheduled for 11/16/20, is hereby continued to 11/30/20, at 9:00 A.M. Note that if the hearing goes forward as scheduled, the hearing will be telephonic and the Court will provide a telephone number 24 hours before the hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 43 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss Case < #36 is continued from 11/9/2020 to 11/16/2020, at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Note that if the hearing goes forward as scheduled, the hearing will be telephonic and the court will provide a telephone number 24 hours before the hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Interested Party Frederick Tan. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-09370 (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 41 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #36 is hereby continued to 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Note that if the hearing goes forward as scheduled, the hearing will be telephonic and the court will provide a telephone number 24 hours before the hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #36 filed by Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Whipp (with Exhibit 1))(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #36 filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Stipulation #37 to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Pursuant to the Courts July 7, 2020 Order setting the Briefing Schedule, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants Motion on or before September 14, 2020; and Defendants shall file their reply to Plaintiffs opposition to the Motion on or before October 5, 2020. ( Motion hearing continued to 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from 9/14/2020 to 10/19/2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #36 filed by Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Suber (with Exhibits 1-4), #2 Proposed Order) (Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd D Carpenter on behalf of Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener (Attorney Todd D Carpenter added to party Shelly Ashton(pty:pla), Attorney Todd D Carpenter added to party Ramon Ibarra(pty:pla), Attorney Todd D Carpenter added to party Jay Schoener(pty:pla))(Carpenter, Todd) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott Gregory Braden on behalf of Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener (Attorney Scott Gregory Braden added to party Shelly Ashton(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Gregory Braden added to party Ramon Ibarra(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Gregory Braden added to party Jay Schoener(pty:pla))(Braden, Scott) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Court hereby approves Defendant's Ex Parte Application for leave to file a memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint. Defendants may file a 30 page memorandum and plaintiffs may file a 30 page opposition. A further reply shall not exceed 15 pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 32 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file A Forty-Five Page Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #31 filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 31 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file A Forty-Five Page Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. upon The Folger Coffee Co. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Ronald Y. Rothstein. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 as to defendant The Folger Coffee Co. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation RE Briefing Schedule for Amended Complaint #27 . Response due on or before August 17, 2020; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Set Briefing Schedule re First Amended Complaint #17 filed by Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Megan Lee Whipp added to party The Folger Coffee Co.(pty:dft))(Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Folger Coffee Co. (Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ronald Y Rothstein counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Adding Sean H. Suber as counsel of record for The Folger Coffee Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Folger Coffee Company. (Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ronald Y Rothstein counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Adding Ronald Y. Rothstein as counsel of record for The Folger Coffee Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Folger Coffee Company. (Attorney Ronald Y Rothstein added to party The Folger Coffee Co.(pty:dft))(Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #21 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. There are a few typos in the caption of the summons request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Ramon Ibarra, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Sean H. Suber APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of THE J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY Defendant, designating Megan L. Whipp as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sean H. Suber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/30/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-27021021) filed by Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant DOES, The J.M. Smucker Co., The Folger Coffee Co. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, Ramon Ibarra(Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Ramon Ibarra(pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Y. Rothstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of THE J.M. SMUCKER COMPANY Defendant, designating Megan L. Whipp as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald Y. Rothstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26926367) filed by Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The J.M. Smucker Co. answer now due 7/2/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co..(Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. (Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan Lee Whipp counsel for Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co.. Adding Megan L. Whipp as counsel of record for The J. M. Smucker Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The J. M. Smucker Company. (Attorney Megan Lee Whipp added to party The J.M. Smucker Co.(pty:dft))(Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 05/19/2020. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, upon Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent: CT Corporation System - Shelbi Sullenberger in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26382296 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Shelly Ashton(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Jay Schoener(pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelly Ashton et al v. The J.M. Smucker Co. et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Tan
Represented By: David N. Lake
Represented By: Patricia N. Syverson
Represented By: Elaine Ann Ryan
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Ashton
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Lubna M. Faruqi
Represented By: Todd D Carpenter
Represented By: Scott Gregory Braden
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Schoener
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Lubna M. Faruqi
Represented By: Todd D Carpenter
Represented By: Scott Gregory Braden
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Ibarra
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Todd D Carpenter
Represented By: Scott Gregory Braden
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Folger Coffee Co.
Represented By: Megan Lee Whipp
Represented By: Ronald Y Rothstein
Represented By: Amanda Jereige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J.M. Smucker Co.
Represented By: Megan Lee Whipp
Represented By: Ronald Y Rothstein
Represented By: Sean H Suber
Represented By: Amanda Jereige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?