Moser v. The J. M. Smucker Company et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Plaintiff: Ellen Moser
Defendant: The Folger Coffee Company, DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive and The J. M. Smucker Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00223
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-07074.
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Missouri the electronic record.(nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Western District of Missouri.(nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
April 2, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL (Insert MDL Number) Conditional Transfer Order filed 4/2/21. (nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement #8 , this matter is stayed pending action by the JPML. Status hearing set for 4/26/2021 at 9:15 a.m. By 4/19/2021, the parties shall file a status report regarding the JPML proceedings. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Outcome on MDL 2984 Motion to Consolidate and Transfer (Rothstein, Ronald) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING from the MDL panel MDL 2984.(nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Moser as to The J. M. Smucker Company on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Carroll, Katrina) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Moser as to The Folger Coffee Company on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Carroll, Katrina) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 USC 1407 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Schedule Of Actions, #3 Proof of Sevice)(tg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
December 2, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants The Folger Coffee Company, The J. M. Smucker Company (jg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
December 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ellen Moser by Katrina Carroll (Carroll, Katrina) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carroll, Katrina) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ellen Moser; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17692465.(Carroll, Katrina) [Transferred from ilnd on 4/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moser v. The J. M. Smucker Company et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Folger Coffee Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J. M. Smucker Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Moser
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?