Washington v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lydia Washington
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2021cv00253
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Roger M. Driskill on behalf of Lydia Washington. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMOWDC-7396486) filed byRoger M. Driskill on behalf of Lydia Washington. Service due by 7/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driskill, Roger)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff has 20 days to electronically file the Complaint. Plaintiff is responsible for serving process. See Order for details. Signed on 4/15/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roger M. Driskill on behalf of Lydia Washington. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/28/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Roger M. Driskill added to party Lydia Washington(pty:pla))(Driskill, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Washington
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?