Royers, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Royers, Inc.
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00679
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 12, 2021 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Hon. Jay Daugherty(Jones, Clark)
November 11, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Clark L Jones on behalf of Plaintiff Royers, Inc..(Jones, Clark) (Main Document 21 replaced on 11/12/2021 at the request of counsel.) (Woods, Gloria).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/25/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2022. Status Conference set for 3/23/2022 11:30 AM in via Teleconference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2022 01:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2022 11:30 AM, and Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on November 9, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER) by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Brown, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Brown, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Lloyd Brown on behalf of Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Brown, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael Lloyd Brown on behalf of Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Brown, Michael)
October 19, 2021 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Ware, Mark)
October 18, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ware, Mark)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #2 motion to dismiss case per filing of First Amended Complaint (Doc. #12 ). Signed on 10/8/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Royers, Inc. filed by Clark L Jones on behalf of Royers, Inc..(Jones, Clark)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 unopposed motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its First Amended Complaint on or before 10/12/2021. Signed on 10/7/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Clark L Jones on behalf of Royers, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/21/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint)(Jones, Clark)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/22/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/5/2021. Signed on September 22, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
September 22, 2021 RECEIPT number KCMO091861 in the amount of $402.00 issued to Wallace Saunders, Chartered. (Woods, Gloria)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Mark David Ware on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Ware, Mark)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Brown, Michael)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company Certificate of Compliance of Def filed by Michael Lloyd Brown on behalf of Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Brown, Michael)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL - KANSAS CITY, MO by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Brown, Michael)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL - MICHAEL L. BROWN by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Brown, Michael)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Michael Lloyd Brown on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Brown, Michael)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County at Independence County, case number 2116-CV18384, filed by Michael Lloyd Brown. Filing fee $402, receipt number none. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Petition, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royers, Inc. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royers, Inc.
Represented By: Clark L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Brown
Represented By: Mark David Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?