Hardy v. Authentic Irish, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denise A. Hardy
Defendant: Authentic Irish, LLC d/b/a District Pour House + Kitchen, G. Palen Investments, LLC and Authentic Irish, LLC doing business as District Pour House + Kitchen
Case Number: 4:2021cv00694
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/8/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2022. Teleconference set for 1/12/2023 at 3:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2023 at 1:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 11/19/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by G. Palen Investments, LLC. (Connolly, Taylor)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kyle N Roehler on behalf of Defendant Authentic Irish, LLC.(Roehler, Kyle)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael T. Yonke on behalf of Plaintiff Denise A. Hardy.(Yonke, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Taylor L Connolly on behalf of Defendant G. Palen Investments, LLC.(Connolly, Taylor)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G. Palen Investments, LLC filed by Taylor L Connolly on behalf of Defendant G. Palen Investments, LLC.(Connolly, Taylor)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kyle N Roehler on behalf of Defendant Authentic Irish, LLC.(Roehler, Kyle)
October 6, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/19/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 11/5/2021. Signed on 10/5/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of G. Palen Investments, LLC.(Buchanan, David)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Amended, Joint from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV18507, filed by David R. Buchanan. Filing fee $402, receipt number BMOWDC-7600400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buchanan, David)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Authentic Irish, LLC.(Roehler, Kyle)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Defendants are ORDERED to file an amended Notice of Removal within seven days. See Order for details. Signed on 9/28/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Crocker, Susan)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant G. Palen Investments, LLC.(Buchanan, David)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Joint) from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV18507, filed by David R. Buchanan. Filing fee $402, receipt number BMOWDC-7600400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buchanan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Authentic Irish, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise A. Hardy
Represented By: Michael T. Yonke
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authentic Irish, LLC d/b/a District Pour House + Kitchen
Represented By: Kyle N Roehler
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: Taylor L Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Palen Investments, LLC
Represented By: Kyle N Roehler
Represented By: Taylor L Connolly
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authentic Irish, LLC doing business as District Pour House + Kitchen
Represented By: Kyle N Roehler
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: Taylor L Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?