Pina v. Shaman Botanicals, LLC
Plaintiff: Sage Pina
Defendant: Shaman Botanicals, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00772
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Defendant to file its corporate disclosure statement by no later than December 30, 2021. Signed on 12/20/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING & TRIAL ORDER. Discovery shall be completed by 6/30/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2022. A pretrial conference is set for 12/21/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6D, Kansas City, before Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. The jury trial will commence at 9:00 AM on 1/30/2023 in Courtroom 6D, Kansas City, before Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Please see order for additional deadlines.) Signed on 12/20/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Sage Pina. (Stallworth, Michael)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Assignment Returned by Sage Pina, Shaman Botanicals, LLC. Jurisdiction by magistrate judge accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
November 29, 2021 THIRD NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/10/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
November 17, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 11/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Shaman Botanicals, LLC.(Porto, Nicholas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Defendant Shaman Botanicals, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall file its answer by no later than November 5, 2021. Signed on 11/2/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of JACKSON County, case number 2116-CV20900, filed by Nicholas Porto. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7641524. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Exhibit Attachment state court file)(Porto, Nicholas)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Shaman Botanicals, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Stephen J. Moore added to party Shaman Botanicals, LLC(pty:dft))(Moore, Stephen)
October 27, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. The parties' Rule 26(f) conference shall take place by no later than 12/2/2021. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall be filed by no later than 12/16/2021. (Please see Order for additional deadlines and information.) Signed on 10/26/21 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing by Shaman Botanicals, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition)(Porto, Nicholas)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of JACKSON County, case number 2116-CV20900, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7641524. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porto, Nicholas)
October 25, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 11/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pina v. Shaman Botanicals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Pina
Represented By: Michael R. Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaman Botanicals, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Porto
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?