Bratcher v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Bratcher
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00790
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/13/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/27/2022. Signed on 12/13/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses, and Reply to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Heather Bratcher.(Kenney, William)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Farmers Insurance Company, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant Farmers Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Petition, COUNTERCLAIM against Heather Bratcher on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Removal to Plaintiff by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Timothy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cass County County, case number 21-CA-CC00199, filed by Timothy J Wolf. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7655565. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratcher v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Bratcher
Represented By: William Charles Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?