McGinnis v. Children's Mercy Hospital
Plaintiff: Shae McGinnis
Defendant: The Children's Mercy Hospital and Children's Mercy Hospital
Case Number: 4:2021cv00866
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
January 24, 2022 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Rachel S. Kim on behalf of Defendant Children's Mercy Hospital. Reply suggestions due by 2/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Kim, Rachel)
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION to stay proceedings filed by Rachel S. Kim on behalf of Defendant Children's Mercy Hospital. Reply suggestions due by 2/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Kim, Rachel)
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Rachel S. Kim on behalf of Defendant Children's Mercy Hospital. Reply suggestions due by 2/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Kim, Rachel) Modified on 1/25/2022 at the request of counsel due to incomplete filing. Counsel refiled the complete document in entry #20. NEF regenerated to all parties. (Kern, Kendra)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/8/2022. Discovery due by 8/8/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2022. Signed on 1/21/22 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Shae McGinnis. (Hardinger, Heather)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Larry Rute(Kim, Rachel)
January 12, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Children's Mercy Hospital filed by Rachel S. Kim on behalf of Defendant Children's Mercy Hospital.(Kim, Rachel)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing Demand for Jury Trial by Shae McGinnis (Hardinger, Heather)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to stay proceedings filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Shae McGinnis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hardinger, Heather)
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Plaintiff Shae McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Hardinger, Heather)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to remand filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Shae McGinnis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hardinger, Heather)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Rachel S. Kim on behalf of Children's Mercy Hospital (Attorney Rachel S. Kim added to party Children's Mercy Hospital(pty:dft))(Kim, Rachel)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Tyler C. Hibler on behalf of Defendant Children's Mercy Hospital.(Hibler, Tyler)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Children's Mercy Hospital.(Hibler, Tyler)
December 15, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/24/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 1/10/2022. Signed on 12/14/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge Greg Kays, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Fernando J. Gaitan for all further proceedings. District Judge Greg Kays no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 4:21-00866-CV-W-FJG. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge Howard F. Sachs, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Greg Kays for all further proceedings. District Judge Howard F. Sachs no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 21-00866-CV-W-DGK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/24/2022. Signed on 12/10/2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV26257, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7707401. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hibler, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinnis v. Children's Mercy Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shae McGinnis
Represented By: Heather Jasmine Hardinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Children's Mercy Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Mercy Hospital
Represented By: Tyler C. Hibler
Represented By: Julianne P. Story
Represented By: Rachel S. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?