Barakat v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Rania Barakat
Defendant: Mike Brown, Bren Brown, Frontier Justice KCMO, LLC, BMB Holdings, LLC and Frontier Justice, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00934
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in support re #22 MOTION to dismiss case and for Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of Defendants Bren Brown, Mike Brown, Frontier Justice KCMO, LLC, Frontier Justice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Durbin, James)
February 23, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to dismiss case and for Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of Bren Brown, Mike Brown, Frontier Justice KCMO, LLC, Frontier Justice, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Durbin, James)
February 23, 2022 Filing 21 SUGGESTIONS in support re #20 MOTION to dismiss party and for Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of Defendant BMB Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Durbin, James)
February 23, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss party and for Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of BMB Holdings, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Durbin, James)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendants' answer and/or responsive pleading due on or before 2/23/2022 unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed on 1/24/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of Defendant BMB Holdings, LLC.(Durbin, James)
January 24, 2022 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of Defendant Frontier Justice, LLC.(Durbin, James)
January 24, 2022 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of Defendant Frontier Justice KCMO, LLC.(Durbin, James)
January 24, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint with Suggestions in Support filed by James A. Durbin on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney James A. Durbin added to party BMB Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James A. Durbin added to party Bren Brown(pty:dft), Attorney James A. Durbin added to party Mike Brown(pty:dft), Attorney James A. Durbin added to party Frontier Justice KCMO, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James A. Durbin added to party Frontier Justice, LLC(pty:dft))(Durbin, James)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 , #11 , #12 , and #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Justin Sadowsky, Zanah Ghalawanji, Lena Masri, and Gadeir Abbas for Rania Barakat allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 Motion to allow Gadeir Abbas to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7750349) filed by Eric E. Vernon on behalf of Rania Barakat. (Vernon, Eric)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 Motion to allow Lena Masri to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7750321) filed by Eric E. Vernon on behalf of Rania Barakat. (Vernon, Eric)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to allow Zanah Ghalawanji to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7750313) filed by Eric E. Vernon on behalf of Rania Barakat. (Vernon, Eric)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 Motion to allow Justin Sadowsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7750272) filed by Eric E. Vernon on behalf of Rania Barakat. (Vernon, Eric)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Rania Barakat. Bren Brown served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (Baldwin, C.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Rania Barakat. Mike Brown served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (Baldwin, C.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Rania Barakat. Frontier Justice, LLC served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (Baldwin, C.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Rania Barakat. BMB Holdings, LLC served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (Baldwin, C.)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Rania Barakat. (Baldwin, C.)
December 30, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Kern, Kendra)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Place of Trial by Rania Barakat. (Baldwin, C.)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by C. Kevin Baldwin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number BMOWDC-7728173. Service due by 3/28/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Baldwin, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barakat v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rania Barakat
Represented By: C. Kevin Baldwin
Represented By: Eric E. Vernon
Represented By: Robin Koogler
Represented By: Sylvia Alejandra Hernandez
Represented By: Gadeir Abbas
Represented By: Justin Sadowsky
Represented By: Lena Masri
Represented By: Zanah Ghalawanji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Brown
Represented By: James A. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bren Brown
Represented By: James A. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Justice KCMO, LLC
Represented By: James A. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMB Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James A. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Justice, LLC
Represented By: James A. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?