Murphy v. DST Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021mc00174
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 3/31/2021 as Document No. 8 & 9, Proposed order and Exhibit. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. Both proposed orders have been emailed to christy_anderson@mow.uscourts.gov This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Murphy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to motion re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Robert T. Adams on behalf of Defendant DST Systems, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 4/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Robert T. Adams added to party DST Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Adams, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Chief District Judge Beth Phillips to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Please note the new case number: 21-mc-174-BCW. (Melvin, Greg)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This case is related to another case previously assigned to the Honorable Brian C. Wimes. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.9 and with Judge Wimes's consent, this case is transferred to Judge Wimes for all further proceedings. Signed on 3/24/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing. Case incorrectly opened as a civil case. The case type has been changed to a miscellaneous case. (Text entry only) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case drawn from incorrect docket. The Case has been randomly reassigned to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips for all further proceedings. District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Michael Murphy (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Michael Murphy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/31/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATED by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. See motion immediately following this entry for details. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. Filing fee $49, receipt number AMOWDC-7336484.(Schermerhorn, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. DST Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Kenneth B. McClain
Represented By: William L Carr
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?