Jackson v. Santander Consumer USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kris Chapter Jackson
Defendant: Stephanie Anne Turner, Santander Consumer USA Inc., Chrysler Capital, T.E.N. Investments, Inc., Soave Automotive Group, Inc., Aristocrat Motors - Mercedes Benz, Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Marion Battaglia, Robert Hellweg, Angela Lewitzke, Sephanie Gador, Kayce Jones, Does 1-50, Jane Does and John Does
Case Number: 4:2022cv00018
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 33 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #30 MOTION for leave to file Dealership Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend filed by Trevor Matthews Bond on behalf of Defendants Marion Battaglia, Robert Hellweg, Kayce Jones, Angela Lewitzke, Soave Automotive Group, Inc., T.E.N. Investments, Inc., Stephanie Anne Turner. Reply suggestions due by 3/16/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Bond, Trevor)
March 1, 2022 Filing 32 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #30 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 3/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Krueger, Kevin)
February 18, 2022 Filing 31 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Trevor Matthews Bond on behalf of Defendants Marion Battaglia, Robert Hellweg, Kayce Jones, Angela Lewitzke, Soave Automotive Group, Inc., T.E.N. Investments, Inc., Stephanie Anne Turner. Reply suggestions due by 3/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Bond, Trevor)
February 16, 2022 Filing 30 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Response to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/2/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. ** Document was submitted via EDSS 2/16/22 and filed today.** (Ellis, Lindsey) (Main Document 30 replaced on 2/16/2022 at the request of filer, due to clerical error; NEF regenerated) (Ellis, Lindsey).
February 11, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION to strike #18 Amended Complaint filed by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/25/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Krueger, Kevin)
February 10, 2022 Filing 28 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Stephanie Anne Turner served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. T.E.N. Investments, Inc. served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Soave Automotive Group, Inc. served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Santander Consumer USA Inc. served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Robert Hellweg served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. *Return of Service verified with USPS Tracking (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Marion Battaglia served on 1/22/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Kayce Jones served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022.*Return of Service verified with USPS tracking (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Chrysler Capital served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Aristocrat Motors - Mercedes Benz served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. *Return of Service date verified using USPS tracking* (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kris Chapter Jackson.(Ellis, Lindsey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing REGARDING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OR ALTERNATIVELY, A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order (Tevlin, Timothy)
February 10, 2022 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for more definite statement filed by Timothy R Tevlin on behalf of Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Tevlin, Timothy)
February 10, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for more definite statement filed by Timothy R Tevlin on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tevlin, Timothy)
February 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Timothy R Tevlin on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (Attorney Timothy R Tevlin added to party Porsche Cars North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tevlin, Timothy)
February 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Kevin P. Krueger on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (Attorney Kevin P. Krueger added to party Porsche Cars North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Krueger, Kevin)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 the Dealership Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time. A copy of this order has been mailed and emailed to Plaintiff. Signed on February 7, 2022, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Trevor Matthews Bond on behalf of Defendants Marion Battaglia, Robert Hellweg, Kayce Jones, Angela Lewitzke, Soave Automotive Group, Inc., T.E.N. Investments, Inc., Stephanie Anne Turner. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Bond, Trevor)
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Trevor Matthews Bond on behalf of Marion Battaglia, Robert Hellweg, Kayce Jones, Angela Lewitzke, Soave Automotive Group, Inc., T.E.N. Investments, Inc., Stephanie Anne Turner. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Trevor Matthews Bond added to party Marion Battaglia(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor Matthews Bond added to party Robert Hellweg(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor Matthews Bond added to party Kayce Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor Matthews Bond added to party Angela Lewitzke(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor Matthews Bond added to party Soave Automotive Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor Matthews Bond added to party T.E.N. Investments, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor Matthews Bond added to party Stephanie Anne Turner(pty:dft))(Bond, Trevor)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 PRO SE VERIFIED STATEMENT and AFFIDAVIT in support of Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining order re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Kris Chapter Jackson. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Ellis, Lindsey)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 PRO SE NOTICE of filing - Notice of Hearing by Kris Chapter Jackson re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order (Ellis, Lindsey)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/2/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 PRO SE AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants Kris Chapter Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Lindsey)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's unsigned motion for a temporary restraining order. A copy of this order has been mailed and emailed to Plaintiff. Signed on January 18, 2022, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Kris Chapter Jackson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/1/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kris Chapter Jackson(Ellis, Lindsey)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)Copy of MAP Notice and General Order mailed to Kris Chapter JacksonP.O. Box 11143Overland Park, KS 66207 (Woods, Gloria)
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kris Chapter Jackson. Paid $402, Receipt No. KCMO093474. Service due by 4/12/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification Page, #3 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Sheet, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15)(Woods, Gloria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42) (Woods, Gloria).
January 12, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aristocrat Motors - Mercedes Benz, Marion Battaglia, Chrysler Capital, Robert Hellweg, Kayce Jones, Angela Lewitzke, Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Santander Consumer USA Inc., Soave Automotive Group, Inc., T.E.N. Investments, Inc., Stephanie Anne Turner. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Santander Consumer USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Anne Turner
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.E.N. Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soave Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristocrat Motors - Mercedes Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Krueger
Represented By: Timothy R Tevlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Battaglia
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hellweg
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Lewitzke
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephanie Gador
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayce Jones
Represented By: Trevor Matthews Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Chapter Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?