Curts v. Edgewell Personal Care Company et al
Plaintiff: Connie Curts
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC and Playtex Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00235
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Katherine Feierabend on behalf of Plaintiff Connie Curts.(Feierabend, Katherine)
June 5, 2022 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ashley Marie Crisafulli on behalf of Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Manufacturing, Inc..(Crisafulli, Ashley)
June 3, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #18 MOTION to remand action to Jackson County Circuit Court filed by David Lee Heinemann on behalf of Plaintiff Connie Curts. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Heinemann, David)
June 2, 2022 Filing 34 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John Phillips(Heinemann, David)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #14 MOTION to dismiss case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Petition Reply suggestions due by 6/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 6/1/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 motion for extension of time to file proposed scheduling order. Proposed scheduling order due within 15 days of ruling on pending motion to remand #19 and motion to dismiss #14 . Signed on 6/1/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 1, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
May 31, 2022 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Ashley Marie Crisafulli on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/14/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Crisafulli, Ashley)
May 27, 2022 Filing 30 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John Phillips(Heinemann, David)
May 26, 2022 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for extension of time for the parties to submit the Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan, and suggestions in support thereof, filed by David Lee Heinemann on behalf of Connie Curts. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Heinemann, David)
May 23, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine Feierabend on behalf of Connie Curts (Attorney Katherine Feierabend added to party Connie Curts(pty:pla))(Feierabend, Katherine)
May 23, 2022 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #18 MOTION to remand action to Jackson County Circuit Court filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Manufacturing, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 6/6/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (McCurdy, Megan)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 5/23/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
May 20, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to seal document #24 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion,,, (unredacted version of Suggestions and Exhibits 5 and 13 thereto) filed by David Lee Heinemann on behalf of Connie Curts. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Heinemann, David)
May 20, 2022 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION to dismiss case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Petition (redacted) filed by David Lee Heinemann on behalf of Plaintiff Connie Curts. Reply suggestions due by 6/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (actual exhibit to be filed under seal), #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 (actual exhibit to be filed under seal), #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Heinemann, David)
May 20, 2022 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages limits filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Manufacturing, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(McCurdy, Megan)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed on 5/20/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
May 20, 2022 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by David Lee Heinemann on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order)(Heinemann, David)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of filing Notice of Withdrawal of Arguments by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Manufacturing, Inc. (McCurdy, Megan)
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in support re #18 MOTION to remand action to Jackson County Circuit Court filed by David Lee Heinemann on behalf of Plaintiff Connie Curts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State court case docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition filed 8/27/20, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Petition filed 12/20/21, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order dated 12/30/21 denying Defendant's motion for summary judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order in Cheatem v. Landmark Realty of Mo., LLC dated 12/12/20 remanding action to state court, #6 Exhibit 6 - Edgewell's Answer filed 11/25/20, #7 Exhibit 7 - Suggestions in support of plaintiff's motion for class certification filed 8/3/21, #8 Exhibit 8 - Suggestions in support of Edgewell's motion for summary judgment filed 10/19/21, #9 Exhibit 9 - Edgewell's suggestions in opposition to motion for class certification, filed 10/19/21, #10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's reply suggestions in support of motion for class certification, filed 11/9/21, #11 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition to Edgewell's motion for summary judgment, filed 12/2/21, #12 Exhibit 12 - Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition to Edgewell's motion to join necessary parties, filed 3/21/22)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Heinemann, David)
May 9, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to remand action to Jackson County Circuit Court filed by David Lee Heinemann on behalf of Connie Curts. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/23/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Heinemann, David)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Motion to Dismiss, #14 MOTION to dismiss case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Petition Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 4/29/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 29, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Christopher S. Shank on behalf of Connie Curts. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shank, Christopher)
April 15, 2022 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION to dismiss case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Petition filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of Defendants Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #14 ) (McCurdy, Megan)
April 15, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss case Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Petition filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/29/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McCurdy, Megan)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed on 4/15/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 14, 2022 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/28/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Suggestions in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(McCurdy, Megan)
April 13, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/26/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 5/16/2022. Signed on 4/11/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Ashley Marie Crisafulli on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Ashley Marie Crisafulli added to party Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Marie Crisafulli added to party Edgewell Personal Care Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Marie Crisafulli added to party Edgewell Personal Care, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Marie Crisafulli added to party Playtex Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Crisafulli, Ashley)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by John W. Moticka on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney John W. Moticka added to party Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John W. Moticka added to party Edgewell Personal Care Company(pty:dft), Attorney John W. Moticka added to party Edgewell Personal Care, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John W. Moticka added to party Playtex Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Moticka, John)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC, Edgewell Personal Care Company, Edgewell Personal Care, LLC, Playtex Manufacturing, Inc. (McCurdy, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of Defendant Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC.(McCurdy, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of Defendant Playtex Manufacturing, Inc..(McCurdy, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of Defendant Edgewell Personal Care, LLC.(McCurdy, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of Defendant Edgewell Personal Care Company.(McCurdy, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Megan A. McCurdy on behalf of All Defendants (McCurdy, Megan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2016-CV17871, filed by Megan A. McCurdy. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7880538. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1-2 - State Court File Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1-3 - State Court File Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1-4 - State Court File Part 4, #5 Exhibit 2 - Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit 3 - Order Granting Motion to Join, #7 Exhibit 4 - Motion to Join, #8 Exhibit 5 - Harrington Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 - Wallis Declaration, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCurdy, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curts v. Edgewell Personal Care Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Curts
Represented By: Christopher S. Shank
Represented By: David Lee Heinemann
Represented By: Katherine Feierabend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care Company
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Ashley Marie Crisafulli
Represented By: Megan A. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care, LLC
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Ashley Marie Crisafulli
Represented By: Megan A. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Ashley Marie Crisafulli
Represented By: Megan A. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playtex Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Moticka
Represented By: Ashley Marie Crisafulli
Represented By: Megan A. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?