Burgess et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Douglas Burgess, Kathryn Burgess, Jordan Burgess and Hailey Burgess
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00262
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/24/2023. Pretrial Conference via telephone conference to be initiated by plaintiffs' cousel for 9/21/2023 01:30 PM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2023. Signed on 6/7/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 6/7/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JURY TRIAL ORDER by Douglas Burgess, Kathryn Burgess. (Emison, Mark)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Plaintiffs Douglas Burgess, Kathryn Burgess.(Emison, Mark)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Denise Fields on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Fields, Denise)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mark Emison on behalf of Plaintiffs Douglas Burgess, Kathryn Burgess.(Emison, Mark)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming William H. Sanders, Jr.(Emison, Mark)
May 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Alex Thrasher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Alex Thrasher added to party Douglas Burgess(pty:pla), Attorney Alex Thrasher added to party Kathryn Burgess(pty:pla))(Thrasher, Alex)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Robert L. Langdon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langdon, Robert)
May 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Mark Emison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Emison, Mark)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Denise Fields on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -Proposed Protective Order)(Fields, Denise) Modified on 5/13/2022 filed in wrong case; terminated associated deadlines- see docket modification. (Ellis, Lindsey).
May 13, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 5/13/22 as Document No. 6, Joint MOTION for protective order. The document has been deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Denise Fields on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Fields, Denise)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Fields, Denise)
April 27, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/6/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 5/27/2022. Signed on 4/22/22 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2216-CV02403, filed by Denise Fields. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7898348. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fields, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Burgess
Represented By: Robert L. Langdon
Represented By: Mark Emison
Represented By: Alex Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Burgess
Represented By: Mark Emison
Represented By: Alex Thrasher
Represented By: Robert L. Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailey Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Denise Fields
Represented By: Charles R Brown
Represented By: J David Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?