Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC v. Samarian Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC
Defendant: Jason Charles Guck, Samarian Group, LLC, Code One, Inc, Intermarket SG, LLC, Alfred J Zaccagnino, Jason Charles and Mark Schneider
Case Number: 4:2022cv00263
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE. Signed on 3/16/2023 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
February 8, 2023 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Code One, Inc, Jason Charles Guck, Samarian Group, LLC, Mark Schneider, Alfred J Zaccagnino. (Woods, Gloria)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to serve the defendants. Service shall be completed on or before March 10, 2023. Further extensions will not be granted. Signed on 2/7/2023 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
February 6, 2023 Filing 10 Second MOTION for extension of time and request for alias summons filed by Jason L. Moehlman on behalf of Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Moehlman, Jason)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT SERVICE. Defendants have not been served and time for doing so has passed. On or before February 6, 2023, Plaintiff shall respond to this Order and show cause why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice. See FED. CIV. P. 4(m). Signed on 1/23/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time and Request for Alias Summons is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted and additional sixty (60) days to serve the Defendants, up to and including January 10, 2023. Plaintiff may pursue alias summons for remaining unserved Defendants. Signed on 11/10/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time TO SERVE DEFENDANTS filed by Jason L. Moehlman on behalf of Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT C)(Moehlman, Jason)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE FOR INTERMARKET SG by Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC. (Moehlman, Jason)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed for failure to serve. See Rule 4(m). Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2022. Signed on 10/27/2022 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
June 2, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC filed by Jason L. Moehlman on behalf of Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Moehlman, Jason)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within fourteen days, Plaintiff shall either file an Amended Complaint or show cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed on 4/22/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jason L. Moehlman on behalf of DOGWOOD SHOOTING SUPPLY, LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7898580. Service due by 7/21/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Moehlman, Jason) Modified on 4/22/2022 to remove duplicate docket text describing attachments (Jones, Robin).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC v. Samarian Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Charles Guck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samarian Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Code One, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermarket SG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred J Zaccagnino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dogwood Shooting Supply, LLC
Represented By: Jason L. Moehlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?