Sanderson-Cole et al v. Coffman et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole and Sanderson Family
Defendant: Susan Coffman, Angela Nicole Kelly, Camille A. Johnston, Lori J. Baskins, Camille Johnson, Romulus Davis, C. Davis, Aaron Adkins and William Hopkins
Case Number: 4:2022cv00648
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Filing 20 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #16 MOTION to dismiss case , #13 MOTION to dismiss case on behalf of Plaintiff Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Reply suggestions due by 12/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #16 , #13 ) (Ellis, Lindsey)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED Defendant's motion to stay (Doc. #18) is GRANTED. The deadlines set forth in the November 7th Order and discovery are STAYED pending ruling on the motion to add a defendant (Doc. #10) and the motions to dismiss (Docs. #13 & #16). It is further ORDERED the initial pretrial conference set on December 20, 2022 is VACATED AND CANCELED. Signed on 12/1/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Copy of this order mailed to: Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole, 807 Elm Street, Henrietta, MO 64036
December 1, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to stay filed by Joyce A. Johnson on behalf of Lori J. Baskins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/15/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnson, Joyce)
November 8, 2022 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Joyce A. Johnson on behalf of Defendant Lori J. Baskins. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Johnson, Joyce)
November 8, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Joyce A. Johnson on behalf of Lori J. Baskins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnson, Joyce)
November 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Joyce A. Johnson on behalf of Lori J. Baskins (Attorney Joyce A. Johnson added to party Lori J. Baskins(pty:dft))(Johnson, Joyce)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/6/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2022 11:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 11/7/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Copy mailed to: Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole, 807 Elm Street, Henrietta, MO 64036
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Nichole Caldwell on behalf of Aaron Adkins, C. Davis, Romulus Davis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Caldwell, Nichole)
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Nichole Caldwell on behalf of Aaron Adkins, C. Davis, Romulus Davis (Attorney Nichole Caldwell added to party Aaron Adkins(pty:dft), Attorney Nichole Caldwell added to party C. Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Nichole Caldwell added to party Romulus Davis(pty:dft))(Caldwell, Nichole)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing exhibits by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. (Melvin, Greg)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION to add defendant Mark Goodwin filed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/14/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
October 18, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Aaron Adkins served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Woods, Gloria)
October 18, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. C. Davis served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Woods, Gloria)
October 18, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Angela Nicole Kelly served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Woods, Gloria)
October 18, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Camille A. Johnston served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Woods, Gloria)
October 18, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Lori J. Baskins served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Woods, Gloria)
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Susan Coffman served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Woods, Gloria)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. Romulus Davis served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Woods, Gloria)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)Notice of MAP Assignment and General Order mailed to pro se Plaintiff at Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole 807 Elm Street Henrietta, MO 64036 (Woods, Gloria)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole. $402.00 paid, receipt no. KCMO097317. Service due by 1/10/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Woods, Gloria)
October 12, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson-Cole et al v. Coffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Wayne Sanderson-Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanderson Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Nicole Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille A. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori J. Baskins
Represented By: Joyce A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romulus Davis
Represented By: Kenneth J. Berra
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Davis
Represented By: Kenneth J. Berra
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Adkins
Represented By: Kenneth J. Berra
Represented By: Nichole Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?