Christal v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Christal
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., Softsheen-Carson LLC, Strength of Nature Global, LLC, Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Strength of Nature, LLC and Godrej SON Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Filing 25 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-1, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Illinois Northern to be included in MDL No. 3060. Signed on 2/22/2023. Case electronically transferred. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (Houston, Kiambu)
January 31, 2023 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michelle Christal. Strength of Nature, LLC served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 31, 2023 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michelle Christal. Softsheen-Carson LLC served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 31, 2023 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michelle Christal. Namaste Laboratories, LLC served on 1/16/2023, answer due 2/6/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 31, 2023 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michelle Christal. L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 31, 2023 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michelle Christal. L'Oreal USA, Inc. served on 1/17/2023, answer due 2/7/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 31, 2023 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michelle Christal. Godrej SON Holdings, Inc. served on 1/25/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Before the Court is a Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading. (Doc. #15.) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants may file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint forty-five (45) days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on the November 15, 2022 motion to transfer. See In re: Hair Relaxer Mktg., Sales Pracs. and Prods. Liab. Litig., MDL No. 3060 (J.P.M.L. Nov. 15, 2022). Signed on 1/30/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
January 30, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine C Battisti on behalf of L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson LLC (Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party L'Oreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party Softsheen-Carson LLC(pty:dft))(Battisti, Katherine)
January 30, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Defendants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson LLC.(Morris, James)
January 30, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to file a Responsive Pleading by L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson LLC. (Morris, James)
January 30, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by James C. Morris on behalf of L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson LLC (Attorney James C. Morris added to party L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Morris added to party L'Oreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Morris added to party Softsheen-Carson LLC(pty:dft))(Morris, James)
January 19, 2023 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Strength of Nature, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Fidelma Fitzpatrick for Michelle Christal allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Tim K. Goss for Michelle Christal allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
January 10, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Godrej SON Holdings, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Softsheen-Carson LLC, Strength of Nature, LLC. (Crocker, Susan)
January 6, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Softsheen-Carson LLC, Strength of Nature Global, LLC, Godrej SON Holdings, Inc. filed by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Michelle Christal.(Gross, Vanessa)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 & #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kimberly B. Massey and Richard A. Freese for Michelle Christal allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 Motion to allow Fidelma Fitzpatrick to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8264049) filed by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Michelle Christal. (Gross, Vanessa) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/10/2023) (Berner, Crystal).
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to allow Tim K. Goss to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8264032) filed by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Michelle Christal. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 Motion to allow Richard Arthur Freese to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8263679) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Michelle Christal. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to allow Kimberly Brooke Massey to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8263666) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Michelle Christal. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 and #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler and Jennifer M. Hoekstra for Michelle Christal allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to allow Jennifer M. Hoekstra to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8262778) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Michelle Christal. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 Motion to allow Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8262758) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Michelle Christal. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Softsheen-Carson LLC, Strength of Nature Global, LLC filed by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Michelle Christal. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8253167. Service due by 4/3/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christal v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Christal
Represented By: Vanessa H. Gross
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Fidelma L Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Hannah Rodgers Pfeifler
Represented By: Jennifer M. Hoekstra
Represented By: Kimberly Massey
Represented By: Richard Freese
Represented By: Tim K Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Softsheen-Carson LLC
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godrej SON Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?