Steward v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angela Steward
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, LLC, Strength of Nature, LLC, Godrej SON Holdings, Inc. and Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00011
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Filing 18 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-1, from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Illinois to be included in MDL No. 3060. Signed on 2/17/2023. Case electronically transferred. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Melvin, Greg)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED Defendants unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint (Doc. #15) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading in forty-five (45) days from the date of this order. Signed on 2/9/23 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
February 7, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for extension of time. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 6, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Defendants L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, LLC.(Morris, James)
February 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, LLC. (Morris, James) Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. Modified on 2/7/2023 to correct filing event, set motion deadlines; NEF regenerated (Ellis, Lindsey).
February 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by James C. Morris on behalf of L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, LLC (Attorney James C. Morris added to party L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Morris added to party L'Oreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James C. Morris added to party Softsheen-Carson, LLC(pty:dft))(Morris, James)
February 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine C Battisti on behalf of L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Softsheen-Carson, LLC (Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party L'Oreal USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine C Battisti added to party Softsheen-Carson, LLC(pty:dft))(Battisti, Katherine)
February 3, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Angela Steward. Godrej SON Holdings, Inc. served on 1/31/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 31, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Angela Steward. Strength of Nature, LLC served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (O'Connor, Patrick)
January 27, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Angela Steward. L'Oreal USA Products, Inc. served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 27, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Angela Steward. Softsheen-Carson, LLC served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 27, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Angela Steward. Namaste Laboratories, LLC served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 27, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Angela Steward. L'Oreal USA, Inc. served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 27, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Godrej SON Holdings, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
January 20, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Softsheen-Carson, LLC, Strength of Nature, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 , #4 & #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kimberly B. Massey, Richard A. Freese and Tim K. Goss for Angela Steward allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 Motion to allow Tim K. Goss to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8264055) filed by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Angela Steward. (Gross, Vanessa)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to allow Richard Arthur Freese to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8263703) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Angela Steward. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 Motion to allow Kimberly Brooke Massey to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8263691) filed by Jeffrey M. Kuntz on behalf of Angela Steward. (Kuntz, Jeffrey)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Godrej SON Holdings, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Softsheen-Carson, LLC, Strength of Nature, LLC filed by Vanessa H. Gross on behalf of Angela Steward. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8260525. Service due by 4/5/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steward v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Steward
Represented By: Vanessa H. Gross
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Kimberly Massey
Represented By: Richard Freese
Represented By: Tim K Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Softsheen-Carson, LLC
Represented By: Katherine C Battisti
Represented By: James C. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godrej SON Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?