United States of America v. Real Property et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property, 515 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 20 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 1 Component FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 111 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 1408 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:22, Ruger SR40C Pistol CAL:40 SN:345-36386, 1 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40, 9 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40, HS Products (IM Metal) XDS Pistol CAL:9 SN:S3630744, 7 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, Glock GMBH 22GEN4 Pistol CAL:40 SN:UPF007, 9 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, 20 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57, 6 Component Assorted Ammunition CAL:38, 84 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264501, 14 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223, Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264506, 25 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223, Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0011-92254, 8 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:22, Marlin Firearms CO. 1894S Rifle CAL:44-40 SN:44400592, 3 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, Intratec TECDC9 Pistol CAL:9 SN:D066413, 1 Round Unknown Ammunition CAL:9, 102 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 1 Round FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 2013 Dodge 2500 RAM Truck, VIN: 3C6UR5CLXDG515784, United States Currency, 18 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362265, 251 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 40 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:57, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362266, Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) AK47/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:AP204496, 10 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:22, 424 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 1 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:38, Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) 206 Revolver CAL:38 SN:RIA1971477, 6 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:38, Taurus PT24/7 G2 C Pistol CAL:9 SN:TLN43838, 24 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:9, 136 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:9, 9 Rounds Tula Cartridge Works - Russia Ammunition CAL:40, 22 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:762, F.N. (FN Herstal) PS90 Rifle CAL:57 SN:FN086975, 47 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, Kimber Ultra Raptor II Pistol CAL:45 SN:KU324036, 86 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386343695, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386203158, 680 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 209 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:Unknown, Ruger Redhawk Revolver CAL:357 SN:503-97368, Glock GMBH 23 Pistol CAL:40 SN:RHF420, German Sports Guns GSG-5 Rifle CAL:22 SN:B032840, Keltec, CNC Industries, Inc. SUB-2000 Rifle CAL:9 SN:ER068, Maadi Company MISR Rifle CAL:762 SN:CM00301, Bushmaster Firearms XM15-E2S Rifle CAL:Multi SN:BK5801908, Del-Ton Inc. DTI-15 Rifle CAL:556 SN:S110194, Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0745715, Citizen Armory AK-47 Rifle CAL:762 SN:538347R, 7 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:45, 45 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, Doolittle Trailer, SN: 1DGRS1823CM098232 and 2016 Toyota Corolla, VIN: 5YFBURHE3GP466796
Interested Party: Norberto Torres
Case Number: 4:2023cv00609
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action unexecuted as to Norberto Torres. (Brown, Anthony)
October 3, 2023 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action unexecuted as to Norberto Torres. (Brown, Anthony)
October 3, 2023 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action unexecuted as to Norberto Torres. (Brown, Anthony)
October 3, 2023 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Real Property. Real Property served on 9/28/2023. (Brown, Anthony)
September 25, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 25, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 25, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 25, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 13, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to 2013 Dodge 2500 RAM Truck, VIN: 3C6UR5CLXDG515784, 2016 Toyota Corolla, VIN: 5YFBURHE3GP466796, Doolittle Trailer, SN: 1DGRS1823CM098232, United States Currency(in the amount of $1,066.00), United States Currency(in the amount of $1,100.00), United States Currency(in the amount of $10,000.00), United States Currency(in the amount of $194.00). 2013 Dodge 2500 RAM Truck, VIN: 3C6UR5CLXDG515784, 2016 Toyota Corolla, VIN: 5YFBURHE3GP466796, Doolittle Trailer, SN: 1DGRS1823CM098232, United States Currency(in the amount of $1,066.00), United States Currency(in the amount of $1,100.00), United States Currency(in the amount of $10,000.00), United States Currency(in the amount of $194.00) served on September 12, 2023. (Brown, Anthony)
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to 1 Component FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 1 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:38, 1 Round FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 1 Round Unknown Ammunition CAL:9, 1 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40, 10 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:22, 102 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 111 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 136 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:9, 14 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223, 1408 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:22, 18 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57, 20 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 20 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57, 209 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 22 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:762, 24 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:9, 25 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223, 251 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 3 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 40 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:57, 424 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 45 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, 47 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 515 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 6 Component Assorted Ammunition CAL:38, 6 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:38, 680 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 7 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:45, 7 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, 8 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:22, 84 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 86 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 9 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, 9 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40, 9 Rounds Tula Cartridge Works - Russia Ammunition CAL:40, Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264501, Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264506, Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) 206 Revolver CAL:38 SN:RIA1971477, Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) AK47/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:AP204496, Bushmaster Firearms XM15-E2S Rifle CAL:Multi SN:BK5801908, Citizen Armory AK-47 Rifle CAL:762 SN:538347R, Del-Ton Inc. DTI-15 Rifle CAL:556 SN:S110194, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386203158, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386343695, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362265, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362266, F.N. (FN Herstal) PS90 Rifle CAL:57 SN:FN086975, German Sports Guns GSG-5 Rifle CAL:22 SN:B032840, Glock GMBH 22GEN4 Pistol CAL:40 SN:UPF007, Glock GMBH 23 Pistol CAL:40 SN:RHF420, HS Products (IM Metal) XDS Pistol CAL:9 SN:S3630744, Intratec TECDC9 Pistol CAL:9 SN:D066413, Keltec, CNC Industries, Inc. SUB-2000 Rifle CAL:9 SN:ER068, Kimber Ultra Raptor II Pistol CAL:45 SN:KU324036, Maadi Company MISR Rifle CAL:762 SN:CM00301, Marlin Firearms CO. 1894S Rifle CAL:44-40 SN:44400592, Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0745715, Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0011-92254, Ruger Redhawk Revolver CAL:357 SN:503-97368, Ruger SR40C Pistol CAL:40 SN:345-36386, Taurus PT24/7 G2 C Pistol CAL:9 SN:TLN43838. 1 Component FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 1 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:38, 1 Round FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 1 Round Unknown Ammunition CAL:9, 1 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40, 10 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:22, 102 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 111 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 136 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:9, 14 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223, 1408 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:22, 18 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57, 20 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 20 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57, 209 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 22 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:762, 24 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:9, 25 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223, 251 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 3 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 40 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:57, 424 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 45 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, 47 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57, 515 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 6 Component Assorted Ammunition CAL:38, 6 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:38, 680 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 7 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:45, 7 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, 8 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:22, 84 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown, 86 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi, 9 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9, 9 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40, 9 Rounds Tula Cartridge Works - Russia Ammunition CAL:40, Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264501, Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264506, Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) 206 Revolver CAL:38 SN:RIA1971477, Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) AK47/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:AP204496, Bushmaster Firearms XM15-E2S Rifle CAL:Multi SN:BK5801908, Citizen Armory AK-47 Rifle CAL:762 SN:538347R, Del-Ton Inc. DTI-15 Rifle CAL:556 SN:S110194, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386203158, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386343695, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362265, F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362266, F.N. (FN Herstal) PS90 Rifle CAL:57 SN:FN086975, German Sports Guns GSG-5 Rifle CAL:22 SN:B032840, Glock GMBH 22GEN4 Pistol CAL:40 SN:UPF007, Glock GMBH 23 Pistol CAL:40 SN:RHF420, HS Products (IM Metal) XDS Pistol CAL:9 SN:S3630744, Intratec TECDC9 Pistol CAL:9 SN:D066413, Keltec, CNC Industries, Inc. SUB-2000 Rifle CAL:9 SN:ER068, Kimber Ultra Raptor II Pistol CAL:45 SN:KU324036, Maadi Company MISR Rifle CAL:762 SN:CM00301, Marlin Firearms CO. 1894S Rifle CAL:44-40 SN:44400592, Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0745715, Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0011-92254, Ruger Redhawk Revolver CAL:357 SN:503-97368, Ruger SR40C Pistol CAL:40 SN:345-36386, Taurus PT24/7 G2 C Pistol CAL:9 SN:TLN43838 served on September 8, 2023. (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Brown, Anthony)
August 31, 2023 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to related case 2:19-cr-04037-RK, this case is reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 4:23-00609-CV-W-RK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants filed by Anthony Michael Brown on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 11/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 515 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Component FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 111 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1408 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger SR40C Pistol CAL:40 SN:345-36386
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Products (IM Metal) XDS Pistol CAL:9 SN:S3630744
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock GMBH 22GEN4 Pistol CAL:40 SN:UPF007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Component Assorted Ammunition CAL:38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 84 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264501
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Manufacturing AM-15 Rifle CAL:Multi SN:16264506
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 25 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:223
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger 10/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:0011-92254
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Firearms CO. 1894S Rifle CAL:44-40 SN:44400592
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intratec TECDC9 Pistol CAL:9 SN:D066413
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Round Unknown Ammunition CAL:9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 102 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Round FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 Dodge 2500 RAM Truck, VIN: 3C6UR5CLXDG515784
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362265
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 251 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386362266
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) AK47/22 Rifle CAL:22 SN:AP204496
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Rounds Remington Ammunition CAL:22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 424 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armscor of the Philippines (Squires Bingham) 206 Revolver CAL:38 SN:RIA1971477
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus PT24/7 G2 C Pistol CAL:9 SN:TLN43838
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 136 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Rounds Tula Cartridge Works - Russia Ammunition CAL:40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22 Rounds Unknown Ammunition CAL:762
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N. (FN Herstal) PS90 Rifle CAL:57 SN:FN086975
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 47 Rounds FN (FNH) Ammunition CAL:57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimber Ultra Raptor II Pistol CAL:45 SN:KU324036
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 86 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386343695
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.N. (FN Herstal) Five-Seven Pistol CAL:57 SN:386203158
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 680 Rounds Assorted Ammunition CAL:Multi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 209 Component Winchester-Western Ammunition CAL:Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger Redhawk Revolver CAL:357 SN:503-97368
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock GMBH 23 Pistol CAL:40 SN:RHF420
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German Sports Guns GSG-5 Rifle CAL:22 SN:B032840
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keltec, CNC Industries, Inc. SUB-2000 Rifle CAL:9 SN:ER068
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maadi Company MISR Rifle CAL:762 SN:CM00301
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bushmaster Firearms XM15-E2S Rifle CAL:Multi SN:BK5801908
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del-Ton Inc. DTI-15 Rifle CAL:556 SN:S110194
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mossberg 590 Shotgun CAL:12 SN:V0745715
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizen Armory AK-47 Rifle CAL:762 SN:538347R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 Rounds Hornady Ammunition CAL:45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 Rounds PMC Ammunition CAL:9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doolittle Trailer, SN: 1DGRS1823CM098232
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 Toyota Corolla, VIN: 5YFBURHE3GP466796
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Norberto Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?