Singer v. Citibank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Ross Singer and Ross Allen Singer
Defendant: Citibank, NA, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00861
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann A Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Jill A Morris
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE pending the outcome of the parties' arbitration. Signed on January 19, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the parties proceed to arbitration in accordance with the terms of their arbitration agreement. This case is STAYED pending the outcome of the parties' arbitration. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report every 90 days during the pendency of the stay of this case. Signed on 1/17/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Skelton, Sara)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order of Dismissal per #15 NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Trans Union LLC only; #16 NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC only; and #18 NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only . Signed on December 27, 2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
December 27, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION To Arbitrate And Stay Action by Citibank, NA. (Casale, Elizabeth)
December 26, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only by Ross Allen Singer (Stecklein, Alan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Judge Morris no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 23-861-CV-W-RK. (Melvin, Greg)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC only by Ross Allen Singer (Stecklein, Alan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Trans Union LLC only by Ross Allen Singer (Stecklein, Alan)
December 6, 2023 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 12/20/23. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/10/24. Signed on 12/5/23 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris.
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 motion for extension of time. Defendant Citibank shall file an answer or otherwise respond no later than 1/9/24. Signed on 12/4/23 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS CERTIFICATE filed by Elizabeth Anne Casale on behalf of Defendant Citibank, NA.(Casale, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint filed by Elizabeth Anne Casale on behalf of Citibank, NA. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/15/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Casale, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Equifax Information Services LLC shall file an answer or otherwise respond no later than 12/26/23. Signed on 11/30/23 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Courtney Klaus on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Attorney Courtney Klaus added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft))(Klaus, Courtney)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC.(Zeeck, Phillip)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/14/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zeeck, Phillip)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by G. Edgar James on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc..(James, G.)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc..(James, G.)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ross Singer. (Stecklein, Alan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of service re #1 Notice of Removal, by G. Edgar James on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(James, G.) Modified on 11/29/2023: Docket text changed to reflect correct filing event. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2316-CV28281, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8732739. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(James, G.)
November 28, 2023 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/19/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singer v. Citibank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Singer
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Allen Singer
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, NA
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Casale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Represented By: Courtney Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: G. Edgar James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?