Liggins v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andre Liggins
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC., Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. d/b/a LVNV Funding, LLC, WebBank/Fingerhut and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. doing business as LVNV Funding, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00897
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 The Consent Motion for extension of time for Trans Union, LLC to file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, up to and including February 14, 2024. Signed on 1/31/24 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
January 31, 2024 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer to Complaint by Trans Union LLC filed by Jenilee V. Zentrich on behalf of Andre Liggins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/14/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zentrich, Jenilee)
January 31, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(James, G.)
January 17, 2024 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP reassignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/28/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 2/14/2024. Signed on 1/16/23 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time. Defendant Resurgent Capital shall have until and including February 9, 2024, to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed on 1/12/2024 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
January 11, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (UNOPPOSED) filed by Tyler J Hamilton on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/25/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hamilton, Tyler)
January 11, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Tyler J Hamilton on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Attorney Tyler J Hamilton added to party Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.(pty:dft))(Hamilton, Tyler)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Andre Liggins. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Zentrich, Jenilee)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s answer is due 1/31/2024. Signed on 1/4/2024 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
January 3, 2024 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by G. Edgar James on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/17/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (James, G.)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by G. Edgar James on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(James, G.)
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by G. Edgar James on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attorney G. Edgar James added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(James, G.)
December 11, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Trans Union, LLC., WebBank/Fingerhut. (Woods, Gloria)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bryce B Bell on behalf of Andre Liggins. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8748470. Service due by 3/6/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Bryce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggins v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Liggins
Represented By: Bryce B Bell
Represented By: Thomas Grant Honnold, I
Represented By: Jenilee V. Zentrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: G. Edgar James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. d/b/a LVNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank/Fingerhut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. doing business as LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Tyler J Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?