Shinneman v. Cerner Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Shinneman
Defendant: Cerner Corporation and Oracle Corporation
Case Number: 4:2024cv00026
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann A Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/22/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2024. Status Conference set for 7/23/2024 01:30 PM via teleconference. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2025 10:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2025 02:30 PM, and Jury Trial set for 3/10/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Signed on February 27, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
February 26, 2024 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Trial Order by Cerner Corporation, Oracle Corporation. (Welch, Sara)
February 26, 2024 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Jennifer B. Wieland(Welch, Sara)
February 14, 2024 Filing 13 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to sever MOTION to compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of Defendants Cerner Corporation, Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Welch, Sara)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 motion to strike or, in the alternative, to seal as to Doc. [6-1]. Doc. [6-1] will be sealed. Signed on 2/1/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
January 31, 2024 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to sever MOTION to compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Patric Shane Linden on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Shinneman. Reply suggestions due by 2/14/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Oracle Press Release)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Linden, Patric)
January 31, 2024 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to strike #5 MOTION to sever MOTION to compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #6 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Patric Shane Linden on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Shinneman. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Linden, Patric)
January 31, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to strike #5 MOTION to sever MOTION to compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #6 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Patric Shane Linden on behalf of Christopher Shinneman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/14/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 , #6 ) (Linden, Patric)
January 26, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Samantha Angell on behalf of Christopher Shinneman (Attorney Samantha Angell added to party Christopher Shinneman(pty:pla))(Angell, Samantha)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Ellen Christina Tolsma Mathis on behalf of Christopher Shinneman (Attorney Ellen Christina Tolsma Mathis added to party Christopher Shinneman(pty:pla))(Tolsma Mathis, Ellen)
January 17, 2024 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to sever MOTION to compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of Defendants Cerner Corporation, Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Welch, Sara)
January 17, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to sever , MOTION to compel Arbitration, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/31/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Welch, Sara)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 2/10/2024. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/24/2024. Signed on January 11, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Cerner Corporation, Oracle Corporation (Welch, Sara)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 2316-CV31804, filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8799209. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welch, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinneman v. Cerner Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Shinneman
Represented By: Patric Shane Linden
Represented By: Ellen Christina Tolsma Mathis
Represented By: Samantha Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Corporation
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?