Troyer v. Director, Missouri Department of Revenue et al
Plaintiff: Phillip J. Troyer
Defendant: Director, Missouri Department of Revenue and Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2024cv00160
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: W Brian Gaddy
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Kevin Mark Smith on behalf of Director, Missouri Department of Revenue (Attorney Kevin Mark Smith added to party Director, Missouri Department of Revenue(pty:dft))(Smith, Kevin)
April 29, 2024 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Defendant Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 5/20/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
April 26, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Phillip J. Troyer. Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. (Melvin, Greg) Modified on 4/26/2024: Document received via EDSS on 4/26/2024. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Director, Missouri Department of Revenue. Waiver sent to Director, Missouri Department of Revenue on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Smith, Kevin)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE - ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR RULE 26 CONFERENCE, JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER, AND PARTIES' DISCLOSURES. Rule 26 conference shall take place by 5/7/2024. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall be filed by 5/21/2024. (Please see Order for additional deadlines and information.) Signed on 4/1/24 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Kitsmiller, Julia) Modified on 4/1/2024 to reflect a copy of order mailed to: Phillip J. Troyer 410 Huntington Road Kansas City, MO 64113. (Kern, Kendra)
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 First MOTION to dismiss party City of Kansas City, Missouri filed by Larry Anthony Dawson on behalf of Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/12/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dawson, Larry)
March 29, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Larry Anthony Dawson on behalf of Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri (Attorney Larry Anthony Dawson added to party Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri(pty:dft))(Dawson, Larry)
March 29, 2024 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Defendant Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 4/19/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by plaintiff, Phillip J. Troyer. Receipt in the amount of $405.00 issued. Receipt No. 2789. Service due by 6/4/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)
March 6, 2024 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 3/27/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) Modified on 3/6/2024 to reflect plaintiff provided paper copy of Magistrate Consent form. (Woods, Gloria).
March 6, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri, Director, Missouri Department of Revenue. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troyer v. Director, Missouri Department of Revenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J. Troyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Missouri Department of Revenue
Represented By: Kevin Mark Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Revenue, City of Kansas City, Missouri
Represented By: Larry Anthony Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?