Johnson et al v. Parson et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Johnson, Nicole Price, Narene Crosby, Metro Organization for Racial and Economic Equity, Inc. and Lora McDonald
Defendant: Michael L. Parson, Andrew Bailey, Jay Ashcroft, Kansas City, Missouri Board of Police Commissioners, Cathy Dean, Dawn Cramer, Tom Whittaker, Mark Tolbert and Quinton Lucas
Case Number: 4:2024cv00174
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time filed by Caleb Rutledge on behalf of Jay Ashcroft, Andrew Bailey, Michael L. Parson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/23/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rutledge, Caleb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs.(Webster, Spencer) Modified on 5/7/2024 main document 11 at the request of counsel to correct filing. NEF regenerated to all parties. (Kern, Kendra)
April 11, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I.Amended notice due to typographical error on original document. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 10, 2024 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/27/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 6/13/2024. Signed on 4/8/24 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Caleb Rutledge on behalf of Jay Ashcroft, Andrew Bailey, Michael L. Parson (Attorney Caleb Rutledge added to party Jay Ashcroft(pty:dft), Attorney Caleb Rutledge added to party Andrew Bailey(pty:dft), Attorney Caleb Rutledge added to party Michael L. Parson(pty:dft))(Rutledge, Caleb)
April 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Michael W Seitz on behalf of Dawn Cramer, Cathy Dean, Kansas City, Missouri Board of Police Commissioners, Quinton Lucas, Mark Tolbert, Tom Whittaker (Attorney Michael W Seitz added to party Dawn Cramer(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Seitz added to party Cathy Dean(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Seitz added to party Kansas City, Missouri Board of Police Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Seitz added to party Quinton Lucas(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Seitz added to party Mark Tolbert(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Seitz added to party Tom Whittaker(pty:dft))(Seitz, Michael)
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Patrick A. McInerney on behalf of Dawn Cramer, Cathy Dean, Kansas City, Missouri Board of Police Commissioners, Quinton Lucas, Mark Tolbert, Tom Whittaker (Attorney Patrick A. McInerney added to party Dawn Cramer(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick A. McInerney added to party Cathy Dean(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick A. McInerney added to party Kansas City, Missouri Board of Police Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick A. McInerney added to party Quinton Lucas(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick A. McInerney added to party Mark Tolbert(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick A. McInerney added to party Tom Whittaker(pty:dft))(McInerney, Patrick)
March 28, 2024 Notice of correction and update answer deadline. All defendants were served by waiver of service on 3/14/2024 the correct answer date is 5/13/2024. (Kern, Kendra)
March 25, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Narene Crosby, Nicole Price, Barbara Johnson. Waiver sent to Dawn Cramer on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Cathy Dean on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Kansas City, Missouri Board of Police Commissioners on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Quinton Lucas on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Mark Tolbert on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Tom Whittaker on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Webster, Spencer)
March 25, 2024 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Narene Crosby, Nicole Price, Barbara Johnson. Waiver sent to Jay Ashcroft on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Andrew Bailey on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; Michael L. Parson on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Webster, Spencer)
March 13, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay Ashcroft, Andrew Bailey, Dawn Cramer, Cathy Dean, Quinton Lucas, Michael L. Parson, Mark Tolbert, Tom Whittaker. (Woods, Gloria)
March 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Arthur A. Benson on behalf of Narene Crosby, Barbara Johnson, Nicole Price (Attorney Arthur A. Benson added to party Narene Crosby(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur A. Benson added to party Barbara Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur A. Benson added to party Nicole Price(pty:pla))(Benson, Arthur)
March 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8907535. Service due by 6/10/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Webster, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Parson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Johnson
Represented By: Brian Forrest McCallister
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Spencer Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Price
Represented By: Brian Forrest McCallister
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Spencer Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narene Crosby
Represented By: Brian Forrest McCallister
Represented By: Arthur A. Benson
Represented By: Spencer Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Organization for Racial and Economic Equity, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora McDonald
Represented By: Spencer Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Parson
Represented By: Caleb Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bailey
Represented By: Caleb Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Ashcroft
Represented By: Caleb Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City, Missouri Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By: Michael W Seitz
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Dean
Represented By: Michael W Seitz
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Cramer
Represented By: Michael W Seitz
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Whittaker
Represented By: Michael W Seitz
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tolbert
Represented By: Michael W Seitz
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinton Lucas
Represented By: Michael W Seitz
Represented By: Patrick A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?